Nader et al v. The City of Papillion et al
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Referred: | Cheryl R Zwart |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00083 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
Benjamin Iversen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Miralles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bryan Svajgl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott A. Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L. Kenneth Polikov
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarpy County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Papillion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacey Nichole Nader
912 Hickory Hill Road
Papillion, NE 68046 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wadith Stockinger Nader
912 Hickory Hill Road
Papillion, NE 68046 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
77 | 77
appeal
Letter regarding Certiorari
Tue 10/08 12:01 PM
LETTER (COPY) from USCA - 8th Circuit 18-1402 that the petition for writ of certiorari is denied U.S. Supreme Court Number 19-88. (LKO) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum |