Albarado v. Haynes
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00038 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
appeal
USCA Opinion
Wed 04/15 10:45 AM
Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment48 , re42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Juan Manuel Albarado: For the reasons stated herein, Albarado's motion for leave to file a supplemental brief is GRANTED, his motions for a COA and for a stay of the proceedings are DENIED, and the district court's denial of an evidentiary hearing is AFFIRMED. (jak) |
|
48 | 48
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Wed 04/15 10:40 AM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to42 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. Issued as Mandate: Judgment. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. (jak) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/17 1:17 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that Appellant's motion46 requesting a copy of a letter and an affidavit he filed in support of his Petition should be GRANTED. The Clerk shall mail Appellant a courtesy copy of document [13-1]. Petitioner is admonished that the granting of in forma pauperis status does not entitle a litigant to free copies and future requests for courtesy copies will be denied. (**Clerk's note: specified document mailed to address of record along with a Pro Se Response letter outlining the costs of copy.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/17/2019) (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Pro Se Response Letter | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 06/17 1:18 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:47. Mon Jun 17 13:18:05 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/11 1:29 PM
Supplemental Motion for Free Copy of Documents to Habeas Corpus Petitioner (sic) filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/04 11:47 AM
ORDER: Appellant filed a motion44 requesting a free copy of some of his state-court records to help him prepare his appeal brief. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that Appellant's motion should be DENIED without prejudice to his right to request relief from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/4/2019) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/04 11:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:45. Tue Jun 4 11:48:42 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/03 8:51 AM
Indigent Prisoner's Request for Documents filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
Transcript Order Form DKT-13 - Transcript Requested/Not Requested
Wed 05/29 9:34 AM
Transcript Order Form: re42 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (jak) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Thu 05/23 11:18 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 19-10544 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 11, 12 Electronic state court record(s), Original document number(s): 0, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 11-8, 12-6, 12-26 (circuit approval is required for access),. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (jak) |
||
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 05/15 4:26 PM
USCA Case Number 19-10544 in USCA 5th Circuit for42 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 05/13 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to39 Order of Dismissal and40 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit by Juan Manuel Albarado. T.O. form to appellant via U.S. Mail at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] . Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (jak) (jak) |
|
Att: 1 (5/13/2019) Request for Certificate of Appealability | ||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Request for Copy
Mon 04/29 10:30 AM
Request for copy of original pleadings from the plaintiff by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Pro Se Response letter | ||
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment
Fri 04/26 8:46 AM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's Order of even date, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this cause is dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/26/2019) (jak) |
|
39 | 39
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Certificate of Appealability Denied
Fri 04/26 8:42 AM
Order: For the reasons set forth herein and in Respondent's answer, the Court finds: (1) The instant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be DENIED and dismissed with prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations. (2) All relief not expressly granted is denied and any pending motions are denied. (3) This Court finds that a certificate of appealability should be denied. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/26/2019) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 04/26 8:47 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:39, 40. Fri Apr 26 08:47:04 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 01/09 9:11 AM
ORDER: The Court has considered Respondent's Motion to Substitute Counsel37 and finds that it should be GRANTED. Former Assistant Attorney General Thomas Jones is withdrawn and Assistant Attorney General Benjamin Lancaster is substituted as the lead attorney for Respondent. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/9/2019) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 01/09 9:12 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:38. Wed Jan 9 09:12:57 CST 2019 (crt) |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Substitute Attorney
Mon 01/07 1:25 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Benjamin Lancaster,Benjamin Lancaster for Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. Motion filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Benjamin Lancaster added to party Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID(pty:res) (Lancaster, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/28 1:50 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that Petitioner's request for an expedited review of his habeas petition35 should be DENIED. Petitioner is CAUTIONED that if he files additional frivolous motions in this case, sanctions may be imposed against him. Such sanctions may include monetary sanctions or a complete bar to filing pleadings without leave of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/28/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 12/28 1:51 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:36. Fri Dec 28 13:51:21 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/21 10:48 AM
MOTION for Issuance Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2243 filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jmc) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 10/10 10:39 AM
USCA Case Number 18-11202 in USCA 5th Circuit for31 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Tue 10/02 1:16 PM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to31 Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. Issued as Mandate: Judgment. The district court's order denying leave to amend the complaint is not a final or otherwise appealable order. Accordingly, we do not have jurisdiction over this appeal and it must be dismissed. (jak) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/20 9:56 AM
Notice of Intent filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied
Wed 09/12 10:26 AM
Order: Petitioner filed a31 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal from the Court's30 August 21, 2018 denial of Petitioner's Admiralty Motion to Amend & Supplement Under Provisions of the Treaty of Gudalupe Hidalgo29 . Petitioner did not request a certificate of appealability. The Court finds that its denial of Petitioner's motion was a routine procedural decision that does not meet the criteria of the collateral order doctrine or the criteria described in 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Accordingly, the Court declines to certify these orders for appeal. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that any request for certificate of appealability should be DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/12/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 09/12 10:27 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:32. Wed Sep 12 10:27:10 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 09/10 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, as to30 Order, to the Fifth Circuit by Juan Manuel Albarado. T.O. form to appellant via U.S. Postal Service[LINK:Transcript Order Form] . Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/21 12:05 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated herein and to the extent that Petitioner again requests permission to supplement his claims and to hold an evidentiary hearing, his29 Admirality (sic) Motion to Amend or Supplement Under the Provisions of the Treaty of Gudalupe (sic) Hidalgo (in Light of Cause No. B:18-cv-123), his Motion is DENIED. Petitioner is admonished that frivolous and malicious filings by prisoners consume inordinate amounts of scarce judicial resources and pose a burden on legitimate complaints. Filings like the instant motion may be construed as frivolous and PETITIONER IS CAUTIONED that if he files any further frivolous motions in this case, or in any other case pending before this Court, sanctions will be imposed against him. Such sanctions may include monetary sanctions or a complete bar to filing pleadings without leave of the Court. It is, therefore, ORDERED: 1. Petitioner's Motion29 is DENIED. 2. To the extent that Petitioner's Motion raises new civil rights claims, such motion shall be construed as a separate civil rights complaint. The United States District Clerk is directed to open a new civil rights action by filing a copy of this Order, together with a copy of Petitioner's motion to supplement, under a new cause number. The Clerk shall mail to Petitioner a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form marked "Amended Complaint" and bearing the Civil Action No. assigned to the severed civil rights claims. The Clerk shall also mail to Petitioner an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certificate of inmate trust account. If Petitioner wishes to pursue his civil rights claims, he shall, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, file an Amended Complaint on the § 1983 form provided by the Clerk. Failure to return the completed amended complaint form will be construed as a voluntary dismissal of the Petitioner's civil rights claims. SO ORDERED. (**Clerk's note: a new civil action has been opened as instructed in this Order, 1:18-CV-121-C. Petitioner has been sent an Amended Civil Rights Complaint form along with the Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/21/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 08/21 12:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Tue Aug 21 12:05:54 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 08/17 10:06 AM
Admirality (sic) Motion to Amend or Supplement Under Provisions of the Treaty of Gudalupe (sic) Hidalgo (In Light of Cause No. B:18-cv-123) filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Wed 05/30 9:16 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Petitioner's "Motion for Judgment"27 , the Court finds that Petitioner's request for an expedited review of his habeas petition should be DENIED. The merits of petitioner's habeas petition will be considered in due course. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/30/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/30 9:17 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28. Wed May 30 09:17:35 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Judgment
Fri 05/25 10:25 AM
MOTION for Judgment filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jmc) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Fri 04/06 1:42 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court has considered Petitioner's "Motion to Reconsider Evidentiary Hearing (To Establish the Facts)," filed April 2, 2018 and finds that it should be DENIED in all things. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/6/2018) (jmc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 04/06 1:42 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:26. Fri Apr 6 13:42:49 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 04/02 10:59 AM
Motion to Reconsider Evidentiary Hearing (to Establish the Facts) filed by Juan Manuel Albarado, re:24 Order. (jak) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/15 11:34 AM
ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, Petitioner's23 request for an evidentiary hearing and request for appointment of counsel should be DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/15/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/15 11:34 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Thu Mar 15 11:34:49 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 03/12 12:55 PM
MOTION FOR EVIDENTRY (sic) HEARING AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jmc) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/02 2:50 PM
ORDER. Before the Court is Petitioner's Request for Submission of Affidavit, filed on February 23, 2018, in which Petitioner seeks to supplement his Petition with his unsworn statement. Respondent filed Respondent's Answer with Brief in Support on May 11, 2017, and Petitioner filed his Reply on June 7, 2017. Petitioner has failed to show cause why he did not include the proposed supplemental information within his original Petition or within his original reply. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Petitioner's Petition remains pending before the Court. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/2/2018) (jmc) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/02 2:51 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Fri Mar 2 14:51:14 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/23 1:43 PM
Motion for Submission of Affidavit filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 02/02 11:07 AM
ORDER. The Court finds that Petitioner's13 Motion to Supplement the Record and14 Motion for Stay of Habeas Corpus Proceedings should be DENIED in all things. Petitioner's Petition remains pending before the Court. The caption of this case has been changed to reflect Lorie Davis, as Director of TDCJ-CID, as the Respondent, and Warden Tommy Haynes will be terminated as the Respondent. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/2/2018) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 02/02 11:08 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20. Fri Feb 2 11:08:02 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 11/01 9:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Sam R Cummings for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost no longer assigned to the case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 11/1/2017) (cea) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry)
Wed 11/01 9:37 AM
Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost no longer assigned to the case. Per Special Order 3-301. (cea) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 11/01 10:30 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19. Wed Nov 1 10:30:27 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/02 10:22 AM
NOTICE filed by Juan Manuel Albarado (mmg) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 06/09 12:30 PM
RESPONSE filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID re:14 MOTION to Stay,13 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Jones, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply
Wed 06/07 10:31 AM
Habeas Corpus Applicant's Response To State's Answer9 & Brief To Petition For Habas Corpus Relief filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Fri 05/19 3:43 PM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTIONS. It is ORDERED that the Respondent shall file a response to Albarado's May 17, 2017 motions to supplement the record and to stay this case, by no later than June 9, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 5/19/2017) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 05/19 4:21 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 15. Fri May 19 16:21:08 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Wed 05/17 2:35 PM
MOTION For Stay Of Habeas Corpus Proceedings filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
13 | 13
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 05/17 2:34 PM
MOTION Supplement The Record filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental attachment | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 05/12 8:59 AM
Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Jones, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 RR 11 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-17-07, | ||
Att: 2 RR 12 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-18-07, | ||
Att: 3 RR 13 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-19-07, | ||
Att: 4 RR 14 of 16 Punishment Phase 7-19-07, | ||
Att: 5 RR 15 of 16 Punishment Phase 7-20-07, | ||
Att: 6 RR 16 of 16 Exhibits Vol, | ||
Att: 7 Docket Sheet 033-CR, | ||
Att: 8 PDR 033-CR, | ||
Att: 9 Judgment 033-CR, | ||
Att: 10 Writ of Mandamus 033-CR, | ||
Att: 11 Memorandum Opinion 033-CR, | ||
Att: 12 PDR & Notice Rceived 2-28-13 033-CR, | ||
Att: 13 WR-78,602-01 Pro se Misc Doc 11-3-15, | ||
Att: 14 WR-78,602-01 Misc Doc Rec 12-7-12, | ||
Att: 15 WR-78,602-01 writ received 10-24-12, | ||
Att: 16 WR-78,602-02 Action Taken 12-16-15, | ||
Att: 17 WR-78,602-02 Pro se Address Change 12-9-15, | ||
Att: 18 WR-78,602-02 Pro se Misc Doc Received 11-9-15, | ||
Att: 19 WR-78,602-02 Pro se Misc Doc 12-1-15, | ||
Att: 20 WR-78,602-02 Pro se Misc Doc 12-10-15, | ||
Att: 21 WR-78,602-02 Pro se Status Request 11-3-15, | ||
Att: 22 WR-78,602-02 2nd Supp 12-23-15, | ||
Att: 23 WR-78,602-02 Supp CR 10-30-15, | ||
Att: 24 WR-78,602-02 Writ of Certiorari 4-27-16, | ||
Att: 25 WR-78,602-02 Writ of Certiorari 7-1-16, | ||
Att: 26 WR-78,602-02 Writ Received 10-19-2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 05/12 8:48 AM
Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Jones, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Docket Sheet 249-CR, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum Opinion 249-CR, | ||
Att: 3 PD-1114-09 Ext PDR Disp-Nfe, | ||
Att: 4 PDR 249-CR, | ||
Att: 5 St's Brief 249-CR, | ||
Att: 6 Appellant Brief 249-CR, | ||
Att: 7 Judgment 249-CR, | ||
Att: 8 CR 249-CR, | ||
Att: 9 Supp CR 249-CR, | ||
Att: 10 RR 1 of 16 Master Index, | ||
Att: 11 RR 2 of 16 Hearing, | ||
Att: 12 RR 3 of 16 PTR Hearing, | ||
Att: 13 RR 4 of 16 Voir Dire Examination Mistrial 6-18-07, | ||
Att: 14 RR 5 of 16 Voir Dire Examination 7-9-07, | ||
Att: 15 RR 6 of 16 Voir Dire Examination - Trial on Mertis 7-10-07, | ||
Att: 16 RR 7 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-11-07, | ||
Att: 17 RR 8 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-12-07, | ||
Att: 18 RR 9 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-13-07, | ||
Att: 19 RR 10 of 16 Trial on Merits 7-16-07 | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/11 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Jones, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Thu 05/11 3:22 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Jones, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Jones on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jones, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/21 8:44 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Office of the Texas Attorney General on behalf of Tommy Haynes re:6 Order to Show Cause,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jak) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Mon 03/20 4:34 PM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/20/2017) (jak) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 4:29 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/20/2017) (jak) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/20 4:42 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Mon Mar 20 16:42:53 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. (jak) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 03/16 2:14 PM
Order and Notice of Option To Consent To Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/16/2017) (jak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Thu 03/16 2:13 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/16 2:11 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juan Manuel Albarado. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jak) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Memorandum of Law | ||
qcref
Frost Mag Presider (Abilene)
Thu 03/16 2:12 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) (jak) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/16 2:17 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2, 3. Thu Mar 16 14:17:31 CDT 2017 (crt) |