Johnsrud v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00762 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Lee Johnsrud
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/19 12:15 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Shannon Lee Johnsrud. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 08/19 4:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 12/07 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Rachel Abrams on behalf of Shannon Lee Johnsrud. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/22 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Shannon Lee Johnsrud (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 04/25 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Rachel Abrams on behalf of Shannon Lee Johnsrud. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/17 1:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 12:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shannon Lee Johnsrud. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Related Case re:1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Shannon Lee Johnsrud (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Shannon Lee Johnsrud. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8280448) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Abrams, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |