Buhl v. Porco et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00763 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Defendant
Charles Porco
|
|
Defendant
Jose Santana
|
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Buhl
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Fri 06/09 4:00 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2017) (ran) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 06/09 3:58 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution. The Court prospectively CERTIFIES that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2017) (ran) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 06/09 4:01 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8, 9. Fri Jun 9 16:01:40 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 04/28 3:58 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is recommended that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/28/2017) (aaa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 04/28 3:58 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Apr 28 15:58:53 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 04/04 3:31 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re1 Order Severing Case filed by Leroy Buhl. (twd) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Thu 03/16 1:30 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
Godbey
Thu 03/16 1:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (sss) |
|
1 | 1
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 03/16 1:26 PM
ORDER SEVERING PARTIES AND CLAIMS AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiffs' claims are SEVERED into separate actions. The Clerk of the Court is directed to open a new civil action for Plaintiff Buhl (assigned to the same district judge and magistrate judge as this action), and to file a copy of the complaint and motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Each Plaintiff is GRANTED until 4/13/2017 to submit, in his respective action, (1) a civil rights complaint on the Court approved form, and (2) a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certificate of inmate trust account, or the $400.00 filing fee. [Originally filed in 3:17-cv-108-N-BK] (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/16/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 IFP | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/16 1:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4,5. Thu Mar 16 13:31:13 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 1:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leroy Buhl. [Originally filed in 3:17-cv-108-N-BK] (sss) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Charles Porco, Jose Santana filed by Leroy Buhl. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. [Originally filed in 3:17-cv-108-N-BK] (sss) |