Wagley et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00766 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kelly Adams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Copp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anne Wagley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Wagley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Frances Wagley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Fri 08/11 8:08 AM
ORDER: The Court grants the9 motion and remands this suit to the 95th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The Court denies Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and court costs. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/10/2017) (sss) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 05/04 3:21 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Mary Copp, Anne Wagley, James Wagley, Mary Frances Wagley re16 Reply (Lang, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Reply
Thu 05/04 3:20 PM
REPLY filed by Mary Copp, Anne Wagley, James Wagley, Mary Frances Wagley re:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Lang, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 04/21 6:51 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA re14 Response/Objection to Motion to Remand (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A- Correspondence from Adams to Wagley, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Declaration and Schedule J | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/21 6:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA re:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/20 11:50 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a response to Defendants' Amended Motion to Transfer is extended to seven days following the Court's determination of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/20/2017) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/18 9:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to7 MOTION to Amend/Correct5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Mary Copp, Anne Wagley, James Wagley, Mary Frances Wagley (Lang, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/14 5:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 03/31 3:29 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Mary Frances Wagley re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Lang, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 03/31 3:26 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mary Frances Wagley with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lang, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division
Wed 03/29 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot5 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division per7 Amended Motion. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/29/2017) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 03/28 12:02 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 03/28 11:02 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA re5 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Transfer Case Out of District/Division
Tue 03/28 11:01 AM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Kelly Adams, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Company, a Delaware corporation for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Fri 03/17 11:38 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Godbey
Thu 03/16 5:13 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC 17-01509 filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8281708) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Pulliam, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A - Index, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C1 - Civil Case Information Sheet and Original Petition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C2 - Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C3 - Notice of Hearing, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) C4 - Citation - JPMORGAN Chase Bank, N.A., | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) C5 - Citation - Kelly Adams, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) C6 - Return of Service - JPMORGAN, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) C7 - Return of Service - Kelly Adams, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) C8 - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) C9 - Defendants' Original Answer |