Burrell v. Papthanasiou
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00767 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dimitrios Papthanasiou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Burrell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 06/13 1:33 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS: Plaintiff's7 Motion to Dismiss has been heard and considered and the Court is of the opinion that it is well founded and should be granted in all respects. IT IS ORDERED THAT this case is dismissed with prejudice as to the Plaintiff to refile same against Defendant, each party to pay their own costs. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/13/2017) (twd) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/13 12:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lee Burrell (Bailey, Palmer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/27 8:29 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Dimitrios Papthanasiou's answer date is extended until 6/28/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/27/2017) (ran) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/26 4:47 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dimitrios PapthanasiouAttorney Craig A Bernstein added to party Dimitrios Papthanasiou(pty:dft) (Bernstein, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Dimitrios Papthanasiou. (epm) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Fitzwater
Fri 03/17 8:39 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lee Burrell. (Bailey, Palmer) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Dimitrios Papthanasiou filed by Lee Burrell. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8281756) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bailey, Palmer) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |