BNSF Railway Company v. FirstEnergy Generation, LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
FirstEnergy Generation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BNSF Railway Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Saturday, December 16, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Sat 12/16 3:15 PM
ORDER granting50 Motion to Dismiss.34 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division, Motion to Stay filed by FirstEnergy Generation, LLC,50 Motion to Dismiss filed by BNSF Railway Company terminated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/16/2017) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
50 | 50
motion
Dismiss
Fri 12/15 4:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Dismiss, Without Prejudice, All Claims and Counterclaims filed by BNSF Railway Company (Furness, Aimee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |