Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC v. Sankar Nephrology Group LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 3:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sankar Nephrology Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Tue 05/30 1:55 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by plaintiff, Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC, and defendant, Sankar Nephrology Group, LLC, filed in the above-captioned action on the date of the signing of this final judgment, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims and causes of action asserted by plaintiff against defendant be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice; and the court further ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that each party bear costs of court and attorney's fees incurred by that party. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/30/2017) (tln) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/30 12:18 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC, Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. (tln) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 05/25 8:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John McBryde: Telephone conference re: Joint Status Report/ Arbitration held on 5/24/2017. Discussed the parties' joint status report and the progress of the resolution of the arbitrability issue. Conference concluded. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Carlos Concepcion, Adrian Nunez; Defense - Brian Newby, David Speed. (Court Reporter: Debbie Saenz) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :09. (tln) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 05/25 8:20 AM
ORDER: The court made known that the parties are to include in the report they are to make to the court by 4:00 p.m. on June 8, 2017, full information concerning the steps defendant has taken pursuant to the instructions given by the court to defense counsel during the telephone hearing/conference, as well as the other information defendant is to provide to the court by such time and date. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/24/2017) (tln) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Tue 05/23 4:28 PM
ORDER: Having reviewed the Joint Status Report Pursuant to May 3, 2017 Order filed in the above-captioned action by plaintiff, Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC, and defendant, Sankar Nephrology Group, LLC, the court has determined that it would benefit from a telephone conference/hearing. Therefore, the court ORDERS that such a telephone conference/hearing is to be conducted commencing at 3:00p.m. on Wednesday, May 24, 2017, with lead counsel for each of the parties on the line, and that counsel for plaintiff is responsible for organizing the telephone conference/hearing via a third-party provider, with instructions to that provider to contact the court last, once all counsel are present, at (817) 850-6654. The court further ORDERS that no participant communicate via speakerphone, as the court's experience shows that use of a speakerphone often interferes with clarity of the proceedings. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/23/2017) (tln) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/23 1:15 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC, Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. (tln) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 05/10 9:39 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's6 motion to stay arbitration be, and is hereby, denied. The court further ORDERS that defendant's16 motion to compel arbitration be, and is hereby, granted subject to resolution of the issue of arbitrability. The court further ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017, defendant submit in accordance with the Commercial Arbitration Rules the issue of arbitrability for resolution by the arbitrators as promptly as possible. The court further ORDERS that defendant inform the court promptly once the arbitrators have resolved the issue of arbitrability, and that if it has not been resolved by 4:00 p.m. on June 8, 2017, defendant inform the court by that time and date as to the progress of the resolution of the arbitrability issue. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/9/2017) (tln) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 05/04 9:36 AM
ORDER denying both21 Motion to Continue and22 Motion for Hearing. The court ORDERS that lead counsel for each party to the above-captioned action and a corporate representative of each party who has full authority to make decisions on behalf of the party meet in the Fort Worth offices of counsel for defendant on May 15, 2017, for the purpose of engaging in negotiations and discussions of the kind the court has suggested above, and that on May 23, 2017, the parties jointly file a document, signed by lead counsel for each party, giving the court full information concerning such meeting. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/3/2017) (edm) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Hearing
Wed 05/03 10:00 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (tln) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Continue
Wed 05/03 9:59 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS REGARDING THE ARBITRABILITY OF CLAIMS IN THIS ACTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (tln) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
ADR Summary
Mon 04/24 10:05 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Harlan Martin. Attorneys in Attendance: Brian C. Newby, David K. Speed, Carlos F. Concepcion and Adrian Nunez. Prv Fee: $ 6,390.00. Outcome of ADR: Continuing to work with parties to reach a settlement. (Martin, Harlan) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 04/14 4:52 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff's deadline to reply and respond to Deft's response to Pltf's motion to stay arbitration, Deft's M/compel arbitration and brief is extended up to and including May 3 2017. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/14/2017) (wrb) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/14 4:03 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply and Respond to Defendant's Response and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC (mlm) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 04/05 4:31 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Sankar Nephrology Group LLC re16 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT. (tln) |
|
Att: 1 appx pgs 49 thru 97, | ||
Att: 2 appx pgs 98 thru 136 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Compel
Wed 04/05 4:28 PM
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S6 MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. (tln) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. (tln) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 4:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned
Tue 03/28 3:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sankar Nephrology Group LLC; served on 3/21/2017. (tln) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/28 10:21 AM
ORDER granting9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carlos F Concepcion. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)); granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adrian Nunez. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/28/2017) (tln) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/28 10:22 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Mar 28 10:22:31 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 03/24 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas F Allen, Jr on behalf of Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (hth) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/24 4:03 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Adrian Nunez (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW028363) filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. Attorney Adrian Nunez added to party Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC(pty:pla) (hth) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/24 4:00 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carlos F Concepcion (Filing fee $25; Receipt number FW028364) filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (hth) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 10:40 AM
Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of1 Complaint,5 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement,6 MOTION to Stay Arbitration ,7 Appendix in Support filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (tln) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 03/16 5:48 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC re6 MOTION to Stay Arbitration (Concepcion, Carlos) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Thu 03/16 5:43 PM
MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Concepcion, Carlos) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (Concepcion, Carlos) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 1:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Sankar Nephrology Group LLC. (tln) |
|
3 | 3
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Thu 03/16 1:29 PM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/16/2017) (tln) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
McBryde
Thu 03/16 1:27 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Sankar Nephrology Group LLC filed by Ambulatory Services of Puerto Rico, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8280520) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Concepcion, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A Membership Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B Agreement to Sell Assets |