Gamboa v. Citizens, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00241 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Citizens, Inc.
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David S. Jorgensen
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geoffrey M. Kolander
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kay E. Osbourn
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harold E. Riley
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick D. Riley
400 East Anderson Lane
Austin, TX 78752 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Gamboa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 05/29 3:34 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/29 3:20 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for25 Report and Recommendations,18 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Rick D. Riley, Citizens, Inc., Kay E. Osbourn, David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report and Recommendations
Mon 05/07 2:51 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re18 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Rick D. Riley, Citizens, Inc., Kay E. Osbourn, David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Tue 03/20 3:34 PM
ORDER DENYING21 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Thu 02/22 10:29 AM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Juan Gamboa, re21 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Plaintiff Juan Gamboa (Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/15 6:07 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Rick D. Riley, re21 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Plaintiff Juan Gamboa(Oakes, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mark Oakes, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Substitute Party
Thu 02/08 9:21 AM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 01/11 7:40 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred18 MOTION to Dismiss . Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 01/10 5:13 PM
Text Order REFERRING18 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The motion is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Andy Austin for report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
22
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 12/13 8:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Harold E. Riley, Rick D. Riley, re18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rick D. Riley, Defendant Citizens, Inc., Defendant Kay E. Osbourn, Defendant David S. Jorgensen, Defendant Geoffrey M. Kolander(Stokes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter A. Stokes, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Riley Retirement Disclosure), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (2016 Form 10-K Excerpts), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C (Nov. 2017 Form 10-Q Excerpts), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D (Form 8-K E&Y Resignation Disclosure), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Stock Price Chart) | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/13 6:09 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Juan Gamboa, re18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rick D. Riley, Defendant Citizens, Inc., Defendant Kay E. Osbourn, Defendant David S. Jorgensen, Defendant Geoffrey M. Kolander (Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 10/03 4:34 PM
Text Order GRANTING17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
37
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/28 11:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Rick D. Riley.(Oakes, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mark Oakes, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
17 | 17
motion
Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
Thu 09/28 9:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Rick D. Riley.(Oakes, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Wed 09/27 2:19 PM
NOTICE and Suggestion of Death by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Rick D. Riley (Oakes, Mark) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 09/08 4:31 PM
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. It is hereby ordered that Defendants deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended by 14 days to September 28, 2017. If Defendants file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, Lead Plaintiffs shall have 45 days to file their response, and Defendants shall have 30 days to file their reply. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 09/07 2:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint and Related Briefing by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Harold E. Riley, Rick D. Riley.(Oakes, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 09/11 8:42 AM
Reset Answer Deadlines: Citizens, Inc. answer due 9/28/2017; David S. Jorgensen answer due 9/28/2017; Geoffrey M. Kolander answer due 9/28/2017; Kay E. Osbourn answer due 9/28/2017; Harold E. Riley answer due 9/28/2017; Rick D. Riley answer due 9/28/2017. (jf) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/31 5:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending13 Amended Complaint., filed by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/31 4:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 07/31 5:00 PM
Notice of Correction: Document lacks a Certificate of Service re13 First Amended Complaint. (jf) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/29 11:35 AM
Text Order GRANTING12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Consolidated Complaint must be filed by July 31, 2017. Defendants must answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint by September 14, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/28 9:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/25 12:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jf) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/25 7:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty PHILLIP KIM. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/25 7:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty LAURENCE ROSEN entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 11:16 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yusuf Ahmad Bajwa for LAURENCE ROSEN ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9617409) by on behalf of Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) Modified text on 5/24/2017 (jf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 8:42 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Yusuf Ahmad Bajwa for PHILLIP KIM ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9616268) by on behalf of Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) Modified text on 5/24/2017 (jf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Affidavit in Support
Mon 05/15 5:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of6 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel of Yusuf Bajwa by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 05/15 5:48 PM
Memorandum in Support of6 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by Juan Gamboa. (Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/15 5:46 PM
MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 03/28 10:41 AM
Text Order GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. All motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel must be filed by May 15, 2017. Whomever is appointed Lead Plaintiff in this matter should have 45 days from the date of their appointment to either: (1) file a Consolidated Complaint; or (2) provide Defendants with written notice that they do not plan to file a Consolidated Complaint. Defendants shall then have until 45 days after the date they are served with the Consolidated Complaint, or until 45 days after they are served with a notice that no Consolidated Complaint will be filed, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. If Defendants file a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, Lead Plaintiff shall have 45 days to file its response, and Defendants shall have 30 days to file their reply. Defendants shall have no obligation to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until the deadline specified in this Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 03/27 4:51 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Complaint and the Response Thereto by Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Harold E. Riley, Rick D. Riley.(Pecht, Gerard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 7:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Citizens, Inc., David S. Jorgensen, Geoffrey M. Kolander, Kay E. Osbourn, Harold E. Riley, Rick D. Riley. (afd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Fri 03/17 7:46 AM
Letters to Phillip Kim and Laurence M. Rosen re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 03/16 5:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Juan Gamboa. (Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9402135), filed by Juan Gamboa.(Bajwa, Yusuf) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification and Authorization, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 7:36 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 03/17 7:36 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Juan Gamboa. (afd) |