Melot v. Willis
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Philip R Martinez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00076 |
Nature of Suit | 560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 06/21 9:24 AM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt of36 USCA Judgment/Mandate (dt) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 06/17 4:46 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of36 USCA Judgment/Mandate (dt) |
|
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Mon 06/17 3:38 PM
Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming26 Notice of Appeal, filed by Billy R. Melot, Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically,. (dt) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 04/23 5:54 PM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of32 Order on Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal,33 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability (dt) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 04/20 12:05 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of32 Order on Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal,33 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability (dt) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability
Mon 04/16 6:07 PM
ORDER DENYING30 Motion for Certificate of Appealability Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Mon 04/16 6:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis on APPEAL
Fri 04/06 5:22 PM
MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal by Billy R. Melot. (dt) |
|
appeal
Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
Fri 04/06 11:59 AM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re26 Notice of Appeal,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions[LINK:here] (dt) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Certificate of Appealability
Tue 03/20 5:10 PM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Billy R. Melot. (scf) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Tue 03/20 4:38 PM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of26 Notice of Appeal, (scf) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Transcript Request (Miscellaneous)
Thu 03/15 12:02 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST, NO HEARINGS by Billy R. Melot. (dt) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 03/09 3:48 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of26 Notice of Appeal, (dt) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 03/02 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Billy R. Melot. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out[LINK:Form DKT-13] (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 03/01 4:38 PM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (dt) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Tue 02/27 9:52 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of20 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,21 Order, (dt) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 02/23 10:30 AM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (dt) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 02/22 4:17 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of20 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,21 Order, (dt) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/21 9:53 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner Billy R. Merlot's pro se "Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under U.S.C. § 2241 and his civil cause are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
20 | 20
25
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Wed 02/21 9:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Dismiss ; MOOTING6 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Billy R. Melot's pro se "Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. §2241" and his civil cause are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 02/21 5:26 PM
Text Order MOOTING14 Motion to Appoint Counsel entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jv) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 02/09 10:48 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of17 Order on Motion to Withdraw (dt) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 02/01 2:41 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of17 Order on Motion to Withdraw (dt) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Tue 01/30 6:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Withdraw Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Withdraw
Tue 01/23 3:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw15 MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by J.S. Willis. (Girvin, Ralph) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stay Case
Mon 01/22 12:19 PM
MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by J.S. Willis. (Girvin, Ralph) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 01/17 2:01 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Billy R. Melot. (dt) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 08/11 10:01 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of10 Response in Opposition to Motion (dt) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Tue 08/08 9:47 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (dt) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 08/07 4:18 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of10 Response in Opposition to Motion (dt) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/03 12:53 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Billy R. Melot, re6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Respondent J.S. Willis (dt) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 07/31 4:21 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (dt) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/27 5:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner's Response to Respondent J.S. Willis's "Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment" is due on or before August 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/20 1:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by Billy R. Melot. (dt) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Summary Judgment
Thu 07/06 3:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative , MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.S. Willis.(Girvin, Ralph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 05/18 9:53 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of3 Order,2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dt) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 05/15 9:23 AM
Certified and Regular Mail Receipt of3 Order,2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dt) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 05/10 6:00 PM
ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ADVISORY. The DISTRICT CLERK shall forthwith SERVE copies of the petition and this order upon Respondent through the United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas. RESPONDENT shall SHOW CAUSE within SIXTY (60) DAYS after receiving this order.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/10 5:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 4:55 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy R. Melot.(ec) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
To be Referred to EP Mag Judge
Thu 03/16 4:56 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (ec) |