Markadas et al v. Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Derick Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Athanasia Markadas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Konstantinos Vallas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/13 3:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas.(Conder, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/19 3:33 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas. (Conder, Dennis) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Fri 05/19 2:53 PM
NOTICE Consent/Non Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Athanasia Markadas, Konstantinos Vallas (Hilley, Derek) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/01 5:06 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas, re3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Athanasia Markadas, Plaintiff Konstantinos Vallas (Conder, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Wed 04/26 2:59 PM
Order and Advisory. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia(aej) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 04/17 3:01 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Athanasia Markadas, Konstantinos Vallas.(Hilley, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order C | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 11:32 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas. (Conder, Dennis) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9399659), filed by Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Company of Texas.(Conder, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 9:08 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Fri 03/17 9:10 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (aej) |