Midwest Surface Supply, LLC v. Meganite, Inc.
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:39 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Meganite, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Midwest Surface Supply, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Meganite, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Midwest Surface Supply, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/02 10:25 AM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/2/2017. (voc) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/02 8:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Thill, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Dismissal | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/26 2:04 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition of Motion to Remand due 6/2/2017. Brief in Reply due 6/12/2017. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/26/17. (jat) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/26 11:04 AM
Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Finalize Settlement by Defendant Meganite, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Saltz, Adrienne) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/12 9:23 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition of Motion to Remand due 5/26/2017. Brief in Reply due 6/5/2017. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/9/2017. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/12/17. (jat) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/11 4:25 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Finalize Settlement by Defendant Meganite, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Saltz, Adrienne) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Fri 05/05 11:55 AM
Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 5/26/2017. Dispositive Motions due 1/22/2018. Settlement Letters due 6/25/2018. Motions in Limine due 6/25/2018. Response to Motion due 7/13/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2018 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/5/17. (jat) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 05/03 8:42 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition of Motion to Remand due 5/12/2017. Brief in Reply due 5/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/3/17. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 05/02 5:39 PM
Motion for Extension of Time (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand) by Defendant Meganite, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Saltz, Adrienne) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Wed 04/26 1:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2017 [:15] (cak) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 04/24 11:53 AM
Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Midwest Surface Supply, LLC. (Thill, Brian) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Discovery Plan
Fri 04/21 5:41 PM
Joint Discovery Plan (Thill, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration (not related to a motion)
Mon 04/17 11:39 AM
Declaration of Brian P. Thill re:7 Motion to Remand to State Court, (Thill, Brian) Modified on 4/17/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit T-1 - Letter dated 10/6/2016, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit T-2 - Letter dated 11/1/2016, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit T-3 - E-mail dated 11/9/2016 | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration
Fri 04/14 5:27 PM
Declaration of Brian P. Thill filed by Plaintiff Midwest Surface Supply, LLC (with attached Exhibits T-1 through T-3) re:7 Motion to Remand to State Court (Thill, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Brief in Support
Fri 04/14 5:26 PM
Brief in Support of7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Midwest Surface Supply, LLC (Thill, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 04/14 5:25 PM
MOTION TO REMAND to State Court by Plaintiff Midwest Surface Supply, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 5/5/2017. Brief in Reply due 5/15/2017. (Thill, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Tue 04/04 8:11 AM
Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jat) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Adrienne Lee Saltz for Defendant Meganite, Inc. (Saltz, Adrienne) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 04/03 3:02 PM
ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Midwest Surface Supply, LLC by Defendant Meganite, Inc. (Cohen, Fredric) Modified on 4/3/2017. (lak) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 1:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Midwest Surface Supply, LLC. (Thill, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 4:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Meganite, Inc.. (Cohen, Fredric) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration (not related to a motion)
Thu 03/16 3:02 PM
Declaration of Fredric A. Cohen re:1 Notice of Removal. (lak) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dane County, Wisconsin, case number 2017CV000337. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1990395), filed by Meganite, Inc., |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits 1-4 Served on Meganite (State Court Action), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Fredric A. Cohen (See | ||
Att: 2 for Declaration filed as a separate docket entry. , | ||
Att: 3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cohen, Fredric) Modified on 3/16/2017. (lak | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Thu 03/16 1:39 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Thu 03/16 1:39 PM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jat) |