Russell v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00788 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:37 AM MST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Russell
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Masco Corporation
Terminated: 05/23/2017
|
|
Defendant
Masco Corporation Disability Plan
Terminated: 05/23/2017
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/23 9:49 AM
ORDER granting34 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, only, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Life Insurance Company of North America, being the last remaining defendant in this matter, and claims against all other having been dismissed without prejudice, the Clerk shall close the matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/23/17. (LSP) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/20 8:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Kimberly Russell.(Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/03 12:10 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting32 the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Thirty-Two Days for the Court to Dismiss This Matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice after November 6, 2017, unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/3/17. (JAMA) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation
Mon 10/02 11:47 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Court Dismissal Date by Kimberly Russell.(Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/05 9:46 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice 30 days after the docketing of this order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. The settlement constitutes an accord which has extinguished the underlying claim. All pending hearings and motions are deemed moot. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/5/17. (JAMA) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 08/31 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kimberly Russell. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Tue 08/01 10:29 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Status Report filed by the Parties on July 28, 2017 (Doc.28 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED setting a briefing schedule for the limited issue of standard of review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Opening and Response Briefs are limited to 10 pages each and the Reply brief is limited to five pages. (See attached Order for deadlines and details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/1/17. (JAMA) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Report - Status
Fri 07/28 1:36 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint, re Briefing Schedule for the Limited Issue of the Standard of Review by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Amended Minute Entry 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 06/29 10:29 AM
AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Amending Doc. 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Status Conference held on 6/29/2017. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a Status Report by no later than 7/28/2017 re: the Briefing Schedule for the limited issue of the standard of review. APPEARANCES: Scott Davis and Scott Harris for Plaintiff. Ann Andrews for Defendant. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 9:49 AM to 9:58 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) |
|
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 06/29 10:11 AM
*(Amended by Doc. 27 )*MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Status Conference held on 6/29/2017. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a Status Report by no later than 7/28/2017 re: the Briefing Schedule for the limited issue of the standard of review. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 9:49 AM to 9:58 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) Modified on 6/29/2017 (JAMA) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 06/28 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 06/27 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Harris on behalf of Kimberly Russell. (Harris, Scott) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 06/27 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Martha Andrews on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Andrews, Ann-Martha) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Thu 06/22 2:29 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kimberly Russell. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 06/20 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kimberly Russell. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/25 8:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/17, at 1:30 PM is reset to 6/29/17 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. All other items in the Court's Order of 5/23/17 (Doc.18 ) remain in effect. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/23 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kimberly Russell. (Davis, Scott) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/23 1:28 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. All parties are required to appear in person at the hearing. No extensions will be granted. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/23/17. (JAMA) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/05 12:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings Incorporated for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/05 10:47 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 05/03 1:03 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting14 the parties' Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America has until May 5, 2017, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc.1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/3/17. (JAMA) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Tue 05/02 4:02 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint (Second Request) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 04/14 3:51 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 15, 2017. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 4/14/17. (CLB) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Fri 04/14 3:49 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 4/14/17. (CLB) |
|
11 | 11
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/14 2:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 17-00788 PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
10 | 10
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Fri 04/14 2:51 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 04/12 9:38 AM
ORDER granting7 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 5/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 04/12/2017. (KAS) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline
Wed 04/12 8:14 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Life Insurance Company of North America.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Tue 04/11 3:26 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Complaint First Request by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Service Executed
Thu 03/23 1:48 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kimberly Russell: Return of Service re: Complaint, Exhibit A, Issued Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Minute Entry upon Life Insurance Company of North America on 3/21/2017. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Wed 03/22 7:11 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Masco Corporation, Masco Corporation Disability Plan.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 9:42 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14021647. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-788-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 03/16 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kimberly Russell. (Submitted by Scott Davis)(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 9:37 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14021647 filed by Kimberly Russell. (Submitted by Scott Davis)(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |