Black v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00789 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:29 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Black
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 20 2019
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Mon 09/09 11:41 AM
Remark: Case transferred to District of Nebraska via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
27
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re:3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
95
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/22 11:48 AM
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 10:24 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-789-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14021995 filed by Timothy Black.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |