Richard v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00792 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:28 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia L Richard
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 20 2019
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 09/10 8:27 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the Northern District of Illinois. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-06018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Fri 09/06 10:03 AM
Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
27
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/26 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re:3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
95
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/21 12:47 PM
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 10:11 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-0792 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14022133 filed by Shelia L Richard.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |