Mullins v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00795 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:04 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William J Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
7
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 01/02 9:48 AM
ORDER - Granting Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the stipulation of dismissal without prejudice of the above Plaintiffs (Doc. 21016 in lead case 15-md-2641) is granted. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/27/19. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 12:50 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-795-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Thu 03/16 12:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by William J Mullins. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14023148 filed by William J Mullins.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |