Cohan v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00796 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:14 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
16
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 01/14 8:54 AM
ORDER - Granting Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the stipulation of dismissal without prejudice of the above Plaintiffs (Doc. 21045 in lead case 15-md-2641) is granted. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/20. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Thu 04/13 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:6 Amended Complaint filed by Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan. Document entered in wrong case. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and a separate Amended Complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added and file a separate Amended Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/13 1:49 PM
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan.(Krottinger, Katharine) *Document filed in wrong case. Attorney noticed to re-file document in correct case. Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1; attorney notified on 4/13/2017 (LSP) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 1:48 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 1:43 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Katherine Krottinger on behalf of Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan. (LSP) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 1:29 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-0796 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Thu 03/16 1:28 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX183317 filed by Grace Hillary Katherine Cohan.(LSP) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Thu 03/16 1:48 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183318 as to Katharine Krottinger. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |