Garcia et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00799 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:33 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dulce Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
18
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 01/07 9:42 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21015 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/30/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 2:07 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-799-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14023833 filed by Manuel Garcia, Dulce Garcia.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |