Garcia v. La Paz Regional Hospital et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00804 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:07 AM MST |
Defendant
Kevin Brown
|
|
Defendant
Vicki Clark
|
|
Defendant
Imar A Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
La Paz Regional Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Adolben Montesclaros
|
|
Plaintiff
Alejandro Rodriguez Garcia
also named as: Alejandro R. Garcia 1111 Arizona Ave.
Parker, AZ 85344 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/19 1:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to7 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 03/27 8:51 AM
ORDER granting3 Defendant's motion for screening. Plaintiff's complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until April 14, 2017 to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/24/17.(EJA) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant
Thu 03/23 3:34 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Imar A Hernandez. (Molinario, Michele) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/23 3:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Imar A Hernandez.(Molinario, Michele) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Fri 03/17 3:02 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/17/2017. (ATD) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Stay
Fri 03/17 10:27 AM
MOTION to Stay by Imar A Hernandez.(Molinario, Michele) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 03/16 4:45 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14024802. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00804 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Paz County Superior Court, case number CV2016-00066. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14024802 filed by Imar A Hernandez. (submitted by Michele Molinario)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Thu 03/16 4:44 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/16/2017*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alejandro Rodriguez Garcia: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, and Motion to File for Request of Payment upon Imar A Hernandez on 3/02/2017.*****Affidavit of Service docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/16/2017 for case management purposes.***** (REK) |