Shannon Riley v. D. Paramo
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02006 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Thu 03/23 7:44 AM
Order by Judge John F. Walter denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat) |
|
6 | 6
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 03/22 2:31 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to the Order Summarily Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed.1 ,2 ,3 ,5 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bem) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 03/22 2:28 PM
ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge John F. Walter, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . IT IS ORDERED that this action be summarily dismissed under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases in the U.S. District Courts.3 LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (See Order for details) (bem) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Mon 03/20 10:30 AM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . Proposed Order Re Certificate of Appealability forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(bem) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et) |
|
Att: 1 CV111 Notice re discrepancies for filing of Habeas Corpus Petition and cv60 IFP Request | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Hearing
Thu 03/16 9:42 AM
MOTION for relief of Judgment Evidentiary Hearing Requested filed by Petitioner Shannon Riley. (et) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Thu 03/16 9:38 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Shannon Riley. (et) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Thu 03/16 9:37 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Shannon Riley. (et) |