August St. Apartments Ltd v. Isaac Obimpeh et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02026 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Faizeh Bashir
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Isaac Obimpeh
4801 August St Apartment No 7
Los Angeles, CA 90008 |
|
Defendant
Abraham Sadi
|
|
Plaintiff
August St. Apartments Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 3:06 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Santa Monica Courthouse. (jp) |
|
7 | 7
order
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 03/17 3:04 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/17 2:57 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for the following reasons: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Improperly removed unlawful detainer action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 10:37 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Isaac Obimpeh. (et) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 10:36 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Isaac Obimpeh. (et) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, West District/Santa Monica Courthouse, case number 17R00213 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg., filed by Defendant Isaac Obimpeh. (et) |
|
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/16 10:35 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER to Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendant Isaac Obimpeh. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/25/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](et) |