Alan F. Seshiki v. Belinda Verduzco et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02057 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Belinda Verduzco
1813 Galemont Ave.
Hacienda Heights, CA 91745 |
|
Defendant
Ron Verduzco
|
|
Plaintiff
Alan F. Seshiki
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Receipt
Wed 04/05 11:37 AM
Receipt of Acknowledgment of remand documents by Superior Court of California Los Angeles County; case no. 11P00307. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 3:21 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Northeast District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Northeast District. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 03/22 3:19 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, Case Number 11P00307, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk) |
|
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 3:14 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Denying3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to state court. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Reasons: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Case improperly removed from state court. Unlawful detainer action. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 5:12 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by defendant Belinda Verduzco. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 5:09 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Belinda Verduzco. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 11P00307 with copies of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder, Discovery to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, filed by defendant Belinda Verduzco. (esa) |