Nancy Pirtle v. Johnson and Johnson et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02084 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 1:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Pirtle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 05/03 7:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03000 filed 5/2/2017. (lom) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Mon 05/01 1:45 PM
Conditional Transfer Order - 30 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2738, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Case transferred electronically on 5/1/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 03/22 10:00 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintif Nancy Pirtle, identifying Nancy Pirtle, Individually and as Successor in Interest to Eileen Litvin, Cellino & Barnes, Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Williams, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 8:02 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nancy Pirtle. (Williams, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 8:01 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19523562 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nancy Pirtle. (Attorney Michael J Williams added to party Nancy Pirtle(pty:pla))(Williams, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |