Martin Vogel v. AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02085 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Vogel
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Regency Centers, LP
Terminated: 04/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled
Tue 02/20 3:47 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Carleton R Burch: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Burch, Carleton) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 02/08 10:10 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel.(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Mon 11/20 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Carleton R Burch has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Disclosure
Mon 08/28 2:27 PM
Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC (Landsberg, Ian) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 08/23 9:40 AM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: On 8/14/2017, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause to defendant's counsel for failure to appear for the Scheduling Conference. On 8/18/2017 counsel filed a Response30 . The Court deems that response satisfactory, and DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Response
Fri 08/18 10:45 AM
RESPONSE filed by Defendants AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC, Regency Centers, LP RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT AUGUST 14, 2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Landsberg, Ian) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Thu 08/17 9:20 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/23/2018. (jp) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/17 9:19 AM
ORDER RE COURT TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2018. Non-expert Discovery cut-off 6/8/2018. Last Day to Conduct ADR Proceeding is 7/23/2018. Last Day to file Motions in Limine by 9/4/2018. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/24/2018 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 1-3 Days) set for 10/16/2018 at 8:30 AM. (SEE THE SECOND PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR FURTHER THE SPECIFIED DATES). (jp) |
|
27 | 27
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 08/16 4:04 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The parties are ordered to exchange initial disclosures no later than 8/28/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 08/16 3:58 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Counsel for the plaintiff states her appearance. Counsel for the defendant is not present. The Scheduling Conference is held, and the Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Trial. Counsel for the defense is Ordered to Show Cause for not appearing at the conference; the response shall be filed no later than August 18, 2017. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Leave
Thu 08/10 10:12 AM
ORDER Re Request for Leave to Appear Telephonically24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that plaintiff may appear telephonically at the August 14, 2017 Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall use the following dial-in information: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1116#; and User Password: 3623#. Counsel shall remain available from 11:00 a.m.- 12:00 p.m. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Leave
Tue 08/08 1:49 PM
First REQUEST to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Ross, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 08/08 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie Lilian Ross counsel for Plaintiff Martin Vogel. Adding Stephanie Lillian Ross as counsel of record for Martin Vogel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Attorney Stephanie Lilian Ross added to party Martin Vogel(pty:pla))(Ross, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)
Mon 07/31 2:31 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/31 2:27 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel.. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 06/14 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)18 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Defendants shall comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 no later than June 16, 2017. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (jp) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/14 10:57 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 8/14/2017 at 11:00 AM. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/13 4:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC.(Landsberg, Ian) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Mon 05/22 3:21 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond, and to vacate Order to Show Cause16 is GRANTED. The deadline for defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC to respond to the Complaint is continued to 6/9/2017, and the Order to Show Cause is vacated. (cw) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/19 12:37 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC.(Attorney Ian Scott Landsberg added to party AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC(pty:dft))(Landsberg, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO VACATE OSC DATE | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 05/15 3:03 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than 5/26/2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following on or before the above date as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Answer by the defendant or an application for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/10 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 05/02 10:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, upon Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Gold - Registered Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/24 3:05 PM
TEXT ENTRY ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Regency Centers, LP, the Court DENIES AS MOOT the Motion to Dismiss Defendant Regency Centers, LP10 , and VACATES the hearing set for 5/22/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Fri 04/21 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Regency Centers, LP. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 04/12 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Regency Centers, LP filed by defendant Regency Centers, LP. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attorney Heidi S Inman added to party Regency Centers, LP(pty:dft)) (Inman, Heidi) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice and Inman Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Ernst Bell, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Bell Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Bell Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Bell Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 8 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 11:38 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, upon Defendant Regency Centers, LP served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, a person authorized to accept for the party, in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/17 9:51 AM
NOTICE to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. PLAINTIFF is directed to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed with the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (cw) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 6:29 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC, Regency Centers, LP. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 9:41 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 9:40 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel, (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 9:39 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19524373 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Martin Vogel. (Attorney Scottlynn J Hubbard, IV added to party Martin Vogel(pty:pla))(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |