Angel Fernandez v. 1 through 10 inclusive et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02094 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cahla Investment Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Angel Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 06/20 9:33 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 06/20 9:31 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that judgment be entered dismissing this action, without prejudice, for failure to effect service and comply with the orders of this Court. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 06/06 1:18 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/13/2017. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 2:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cahla Investment Group, Inc. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angel Fernandez, (Kim, Sung) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angel Fernandez. (Kim, Sung) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 12:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Angel Fernandez. (Kim, Sung) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19526041 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Angel Fernandez. (Attorney Sung T Kim added to party Angel Fernandez(pty:pla))(Kim, Sung) |