Unicolors, Inc. v. Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02100 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jay Oh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Unicolors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 9:49 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Unicolors, Inc..(Jeong, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/20 3:00 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/20 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jay Oh, identifying Jay Oh, an individual. (Lee, Frank) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/20 12:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jay Oh.(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Jay Oh(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/20 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc., identifying Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc., a California corporation. (Lee, Frank) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/20 12:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc..(Attorney Frank N Lee added to party Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/11 12:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc. served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Reyes, person apparently in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/11 12:26 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Jay Oh served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Reyes, person apparently in charge at the office in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 2:43 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:53 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Jay Oh, Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:50 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 2:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 2:01 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Jeong, Chan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 1:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19527050 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C |