Doug Adler v. ESPN Productions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02101 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
ESPN Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Gross
|
|
Defendant
Jamie Reynolds
|
|
Plaintiff
Doug Adler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 9:52 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (cr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Remand Case to State Court
Wed 03/22 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS remanding case to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, Case number BC650526 by Judge Percy Anderson: [T]his Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC650526 for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/21 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed under separate events, not as attachments to the removal. No further action is required unless requested by the Court. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:33 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC650526 Receipt No: 0973-19527254 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ESPN Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Raymond William Bertrand added to party ESPN Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bertrand, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit A to Ntc. of Removal - Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Ntc. of Removal - Decl. of D. Adkins, | ||
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit C to Ntc. of Removal - Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Ntc. of Removal - Ntc. to Adverse Party, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Ntc. of Removal - Ntc. to Superior Court, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 8:26 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Doug Adler in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/14/2017, and attached to Notice of Removal1 as Exhibit A. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 8:29 AM
CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant ESPN Productions, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/14/2017, attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit C.(jtil) |