C-Suite Media, Inc. v. C-Suite Network et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02102 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
C-Suite Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C-Suite Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C-Suite Investor Council, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C-Suite Network
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Hayzlett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karl Post
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C-Suite Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
61 | 61
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 12/06 2:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) the parties have Stipulated to the dismissal of the action60 . All claims and counterclaims in this action are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. (gk) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
60 | 60
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 12/01 11:59 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff C-Suite Media, Inc..(Sereboff, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |