Frank Cannon v. Elvin Valenzuela
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02108 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Thu 02/01 9:13 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Petition for Certificate of Appealability,7 filed by Frank Cannon. CCA # 17-55863 The request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Wed 06/21 10:32 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55863 assigned to Petition for Certificate of Appealability,7 as to Petitioner Frank Cannon. (shb) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Certificate of Appealability
Fri 06/16 1:37 PM
REQUEST/Application for Certificate of Appealability to USDC by petitioner Frank Cannon; Filed as Notice of Appeal to 9th CCA from District Court Judgment filed 4/11/17. Certificate of Appealability has been ruled on 4/11/17, see document 6. (mat) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Wed 04/12 11:27 AM
ORDER DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Cormac J. Carney (car) |
|
5 | 5
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 04/11 3:54 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Pursuant to the Order of Summary Dismissal Without Prejudice4 , IT IS ADJUDGED that that the petition is summarily dismissed. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (dro) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 04/11 3:52 PM
ORDER of Summary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Based on the foregoing, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that judgment be entered summarily dismissing the Petition without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 6:10 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL
Thu 03/16 6:10 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Frank Cannon. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Thu 03/16 6:09 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, (Filing fee $ 5 paid), filed by petitioner Frank Cannon. (esa) |