Mark E. Dressen v. Jefferson B. Sessions
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02114 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jefferson B. Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark E Dressen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
order
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/13 4:22 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS39 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court dismisses the entirety of the amended complaint. (See document for details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/12 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Motion to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions39 is submitted. Order to issue. The 4/16/2018 hearing is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 04/02 3:37 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 39 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. (Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
misc
For Judicial Notice
Sat 03/24 8:25 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 39 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen.(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cmplt in Lamb v. Sessions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Def.Ans. in Lamb v. Sessions | ||
40 | 40
25
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Sat 03/24 8:13 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 39 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen.(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Atty Bromwich Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 03/02 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 02/16 8:00 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Jefferson B. Sessions amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Alter Judgment Leave to File Document
Fri 01/26 11:14 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:33 MOTION for Leave to File. The Court GRANTS plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint. (mrgo) |
|
36 | 36
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 01/25 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Motion to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Sealed Motion/MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen33 is suitable to a determination without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Local Rule 7-15. The hearing scheduled for 1/29/2018 is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Saturday, January 13, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Sat 01/13 11:12 AM
REPLY Reply in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)32 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/08 1:26 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)32 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. (Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Saturday, November 25, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Alter Judgment Leave to File Document
Sat 11/25 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)32 . , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Dismiss Case Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
Thu 11/02 3:45 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT-MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 10/26 2:21 PM
IN CHAMBERS ONLY-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant24 ; and the MOTION to dismiss filed by Defendant28 are suitable to a determination without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Local Rule 7-15. The hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 10/16 4:21 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's claim re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,27 28 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Applicable Rules | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 09/28 3:23 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's claim re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,27 28 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen.(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Copy of Lamb v. Sessions Ruling, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
Fri 08/18 10:27 AM
SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's claim re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,27 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - August 27, 2015 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - September 27, 2015 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - January 13, 2016 Letter | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Thu 08/17 3:48 PM
ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re:23 APPLICATION to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Compelling reasons exist at this time to seal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and related filings, including the attached declarations and exhibits. Accordingly, Defendant's application is granted. See document for details. (smo) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 08/16 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Corrected Proposed Order re APPLICATION to file document Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits Thereto under seal23(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 08/14 11:25 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to file document Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits Thereto under seal23 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Sealed Declaration in support of the Application is missing. Please refer to L.R. 79 for the proper e-filing procedure. Or go to our Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov, go to the E-Filing tab, click on Sealed Documents. There should be 2 docket entries made: 1) Application (as main document), Proposed order (as 1st attachment), & Redacted Document (as 2nd attachment); 2) Sealed Declaration in Support (as main document) & Unredacted Document (as 1st attachment). Other error(s) with document(s): The proposed order is directed to the assigned Magistrate Judge instead of District Judge Wilson. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/11 6:47 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Statement on Filing Redacted Motion | ||
23 | 23
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Fri 08/11 10:12 AM
APPLICATION to file document Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits Thereto under seal filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Application, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 08/01 7:38 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mark E Dressen answer now due 8/11/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 07/24 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Acrivi Coromelas counsel for Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. Acrivi Coromelas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Acrivi Coromelas. (Coromelas, Acrivi) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 06/28 1:51 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)17 . Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions' answer due 8/2/2017. (mrgo) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Appearance
Wed 06/28 8:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Martin M Tomlinson on behalf of Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions (Attorney Martin M Tomlinson added to party Jefferson B. Sessions(pty:dft))(Tomlinson, Martin) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Lodging
Tue 06/27 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)17(Coromelas, Acrivi) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer the Complaint | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 06/26 2:43 PM
Amended STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Coromelas, Acrivi) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 06/26 11:04 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Coromelas, Acrivi) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/23 3:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jefferson B. Sessions answer now due 7/3/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions.(Attorney Acrivi Coromelas added to party Jefferson B. Sessions(pty:dft))(Coromelas, Acrivi) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Wed 04/26 2:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen, upon Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions served on 4/10/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to (illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (illegible). The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service on USAO | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/05 12:20 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Re-serving of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. Certified mail this date. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 04/04 3:47 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Tue 04/04 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen, upon Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions served on 3/29/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to (illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (Illegible). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to (Illegible). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Affidavits of Service are attached.(Stevens, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - USAO | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Fri 03/31 9:17 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02114 SVW(FFMx). (rn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:41 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:41 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jefferson B. Sessions. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 11:38 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen, (Stevens, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 4:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. (Stevens, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19529379 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mark E Dressen. (Attorney Richard W Stevens added to party Mark E Dressen(pty:pla))(Stevens, Richard) |