William J. Richards v. County of San Bernardino et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Hernan D Vera |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00497 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jan 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Daniel Gregonis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Navarro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom Bradford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Norman Sperber
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norman Parent
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Nourse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
County of San Bernardino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William J. Richards
Benner & Boon, LLP 1516 Front Street San Diego
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
San Bernardino County Sheriffs Office
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
|
Defendant
San Bernardino County District Attorney Office
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
|
Defendant
Michael Risley
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
|
Defendant
Craig Ogino
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
|
Defendant
Ramos Michael
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
191 | 191
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/18 11:19 AM
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for settlement proceedings. The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for April 24, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
190 | 190
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/15 12:33 PM
AMENDED MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE TRIAL, SCHEDULING, AND MOTION DATES188 held before Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court held a Scheduling Conference with the parties on 3/13/24. Having considered the parties' proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 2/27/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/25/2025 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. The case is referred to Judge Sheri Pym for mediation. See Minutes for additional deadlines. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (lom) Modified on 3/15/2024 (lom) |
|
189 | 189
18
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/13 3:33 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom) |
|
188 | 188
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/13 3:29 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE TRIAL, SCHEDULING, AND MOTION DATES held before Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court held a Scheduling Conference with the parties on 3/13/24. Having considered the parties proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 2/27/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/25/2025 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See minutes for additional deadlines. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
187 | 187
order
Leave to Appear
Tue 03/12 1:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE COUNSEL'S REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 13, 2024186 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Defense counsel may appear at the Status Conference remotely by Zoom. A link will be provided directly to counsel. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
186 | 186
motion
Appear
Mon 03/11 10:47 AM
REQUEST for Leave of Susan E. Coleman to Appear for STATUS CONFERENCE set for March 13, 2024, REMOTELY BY ZOOM filed by defendants County of San Bernardino, Daniel Gregonis. (Coleman, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |