James Sprowls v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen L Stevenson |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00499 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 06, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Thu 11/01 3:21 PM
ORDER AWARDING EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO 28 USC section 2412(d) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson that fees in the amount of $3,900.00 as authorized by 28 USC 2412(d) shall be awarded, subject to terms of the Stipulation33 . (jp) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Wed 10/31 4:08 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3900. filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 08/06 1:19 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Related to: Memorandum Opinion and Order,31 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is reversed, and the above-captioned action is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the provisions of the Memorandum Opinion and Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
31 | 31
13
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 08/06 1:17 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED, and this case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Thu 05/31 1:43 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/02 12:22 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File28 . Plaintiff shall have until April 4, 2018 to prepare and deliver his portion of the Joint Submission to Defendant. The parties shall file the Joint Submission on or before May 30, 2018. The Court does not anticipate granting any further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. (hr) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 03/30 10:34 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/30 4:24 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File26 . On January 29, 2018, Plaintiff filed the third stipulation for an extension of time to prepare and deliver his portion of the Joint Submission to Defendant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until March 5, 2018 to prepare and deliver his portion of the Joint Submission to Defendant. Defendant shall have until April 9, 2018 to prepare and deliver Defendant's portion of the Joint Submission. Plaintiff shall have until April 23, 2018 to reply. The parties shall file the Joint Submission on or before April 30, 2018. (gr) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 01/29 1:49 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extension of Time | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/05 11:09 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File24 . Plaintiff shall have until January 16, 2018 to prepare and deliver his portion of the Joint Submission to Defendant and all other dates are extended accordingly. The parties shall file the Joint Submission on or before March 13, 2018. (rh) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 01/04 12:03 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extension of Time | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/20 2:53 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File22 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until December 11, 2017 to prepare and deliver his portion of the Joint Submission to Defendant and all other dates are extended accordingly. The parties shall file the Joint Submission on or before February 5, 2018. (rh) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/13 11:06 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Administrative Record
Wed 09/06 9:33 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF JAMES SPROWLS (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/06 9:25 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Fri 08/11 5:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File17 , Order,18 . The Court granted the parties stipulation for an extension of time for Plaintiff to provide Defendant with his Settlement Letter Brief. (Dkt. No. 18.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the last sentence of that Order is deleted and amended to read: Defendant shall file the Answer and Administrative Record no later than September 6, 2017, and the parties shall file the Joint Stipulation no later than December 6, 2017. (rh) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 08/10 12:30 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until August 9, 2017 to provide Defendant with Plaintiffs Settlement Letter Brief and all other dates are extended accordingly. The parties shall file the Joint Stipulation on or before December 6, 2017.17 (gr) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/09 1:23 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff James Sprowls.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/03 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF JAMES SPROWLS filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Letellier, Marla) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/19 12:39 PM
Notice Update: Judge Stevenson will conduct all Court appearances in Courtroom 580, 5th floor located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Please update your records to reflect this change. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/05 11:21 AM
Effective June 8, 2017, Judge Stevenson will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, Suite 8100, on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 570 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/20 11:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV17-499 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/19 1:07 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 04/06 4:14 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Thu 04/06 4:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Sprowls, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/4/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 12:40 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbu) |
|
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/20 11:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: re: Complaint1 . ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. ( SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (sbu) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbu) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 5:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls, (Rosales, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 5:40 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 5:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff James Sprowls. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party James Sprowls(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) |