Asics America Corporation v. Charles Stanley et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00466 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donald J Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Asics America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/15 2:34 PM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting MOTION to Dismiss11 . The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff ASICS America Corporation's ("Plaintiff") First Amended Complaint in this matter, filed by Defendants Donald J. Lucas and Charles Stanley ("Defendants"), came on regularly for hearing before this Court on June 5, 2017. Having considered the moving and opposition papers, arguments, and all other matters presented to the Court, the Court finds as follows: Plaintiff has failed to meet its burden to establish that Defendants are subject to personal jurisdiction in the State of California. The evidence submitted in support of the motion establishes that Defendants, both of whom are Texas residents, are not subject to general or specific jurisdiction in California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss Case
Wed 06/07 4:07 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss11 . The Court, having been informed by the parties in this action that they submit on the Court's tentative ruling previously issued, hereby GRANTS the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss regarding Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows:(see document for details) (mba) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/22 3:26 PM
REPLY reply in support of motion to dismiss Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim 11 filed by Defendant Donald J Lucas. (Attorney Ronald J Thommarson added to party Donald J Lucas(pty:dft))(Thommarson, Ronald) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/15 4:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim 11 filed by Plaintiff Asics America Corporation. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/15 4:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Asics America Corporation, identifying ASICS America Holdings; ASICS Corporation. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/13 3:09 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 04/13 11:14 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss Case
Tue 04/04 12:26 PM
Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Gates, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Donald Lucas, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Charles Stanley, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss Case
Mon 04/03 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Gates, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Charles Stanley, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Donald Lucas, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum Request of Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 03/21 11:34 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Charles Stanley.(Gates, Sean) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/20 5:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441 [Diversity]; Civil Cover Sheet; Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1). (Gates, Sean) |
|
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110)
Mon 03/20 4:23 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 17-00466 JVS (JDEx). (dv) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:32 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 10:03 AM
Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley, (Gates, Sean) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 10:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley. (Gates, Sean) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior Court, case number 30-2017 00901360-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-19524633 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley. (Attorney Sean P Gates added to party Donald J Lucas(pty:dft), Attorney Sean P Gates added to party Charles Stanley(pty:dft))(Gates, Sean) |
|
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 3:22 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, Inclusive, Donald J Lucas, Charles Stanley, filed by Plaintiff Asics America Corporation. Filed in State Court on 2/3/17 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/17 3:31 PM
UNCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Asics America Corporation, upon Defendant Donald J Lucas served on 2/6/2017, answer due 2/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Louris Sandavol Live In Housekeeper in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Exhibit B to Notice of Removal. (car) |