Matthew Verdiglione v. Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00467 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Verdiglione
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 06/05 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 05/30 9:36 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione(Cornell, Ross) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 05/10 1:16 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS11 by Judge David O. Carter: For the reasons explained above, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, if desired, on or before May 30, 2017. (es) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Joinder
Wed 05/10 11:00 AM
JOINDER filed by Defendant Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc. joining in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(6) 11 .(Cullman, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 05/01 7:37 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(6) 11 filed by Defendant Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC.(Stern, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Verdiglione v. 10952 Reagan St., LLC; Beachwood Dental, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Verdiglione v. Artesia Inglewood Plaza, LLC; J. Flowers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Verdiglione v. Charles Edward Yoder; Town and Country, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Verdiglione v. HCH Investments, LLC et al, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Verdiglione v. Ismae Mendoza; Luz Patricia Mendoza, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Verdiglione v. Karen Neishi; Cypress Florist, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Verdiglione v. Peter Paley et al, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Verdiglione v. Reynaldo C. Lozano; El Presidente Market, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Verdiglione v. Tubafor Country, LLC; Sixty-Minut, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Verdigllione v. 500 West Balboa, LLC; My Galley | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/01 7:22 PM
REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(6) 11 filed by Defendant Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC.(Stern, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF HARRY S. STERN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Verdiglione v. 10952 Reagan St., LLC; Beachwood Dental, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Verdiglione v. Artesia Inglewood Plaza, LLC; J. Flowers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Verdiglione v. Charles Edward Yoder; Town and Country, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Verdiglione v. HCH Investments, LLC et al, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E- Verdiglione v. Ismae Mendoza; Luz Patricia Mendoza, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Verdiglione v. Karen Neishi; Cypress Florist, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Verdiglione v. Peter Paley et al, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Verdiglione v. Reynaldo C. Lozano; El Presidente Market, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Verdiglione v. Tubafor Country, LLC; Sixty-Minut, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J - Verdigllione v. 500 West Balboa, LLC; My Galley, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ANAHEIM HILLS ENTERPRISES, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/26 9:54 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc. answer now due 5/11/2017, filed by defendant Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc..(Attorney Lori M Cullman added to party Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cullman, Lori) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/17 4:09 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(6) 11 filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 04/14 11:31 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss11 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/13 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attorney Harry S Stern added to party Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft)) (Stern, Harry) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/11 12:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc. served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zach Davis, President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/11 12:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys Aguilera, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 1:29 PM
|
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 8:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Anaheim Hills Enterprises, LLC, Choice Plus Insurance Services, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 8:27 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 8:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 11:06 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 11:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19525411 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross) |