William Seltzer v. Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00470 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Seltzer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 09/25 2:45 PM
ORDER TO DISMISS WITHPREJUDICE14 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, that all claims of Plaintiff that were or could have been asserted in the current lawsuit against Defendant Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC, are dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff and Defendants shall each bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/31 11:22 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Plaintiff William Seltzer.(Berlin, Barak) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Dismiss with Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/05 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court hereby vacates and takes off calendar the Status Conference scheduled for July 10, 2017. No appearances are necessary. The parties shall continue to meet and confer and try to resolve this matter without the need for trial.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 06/16 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on September 8, 2017. (mku) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/15 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Status Conference set for Monday, July 10, 2017 at 2:45 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/26 12:26 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC, identifying William Seltzer (Plaintiff), Williams & Rivera Litigation Group, LLC (Defendant), Jason Rodriguez (Defendant Principal). (Kearney, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/26 12:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC.(Attorney Mark T Kearney added to party Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Kearney, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 05/24 3:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Seltzer, upon Defendant Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason Rodriguez, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Berlin, Barak) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/03 11:14 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Williams and Rivera Litigation Group, LLC. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Tue 05/02 9:06 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff William Seltzer. (Berlin, Barak) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 9:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:19 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff William Seltzer, identifying William Seltzer, Williams & Rivera Litigation Group, LLC, and Jason Rodriguez. (Berlin, Barak) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 3:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff William Seltzer. (Berlin, Barak) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19528145 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff William Seltzer. (Attorney Barak J Berlin added to party William Seltzer(pty:pla))(Berlin, Barak) |