Luis Flores v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00474 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Flores
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 07/03 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Luis Flores. Dismissal is with Prejudice as to Plaintiff only. (DeSario, Molly) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/26 4:24 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing) 22 filed by Plaintiff Luis Flores.(Mauro, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 06/05 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attorney Jenny Lynn Grantz added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft)) (Grantz, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 05/15 2:49 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Luis Flores(DeSario, Molly) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Fri 04/28 3:20 PM
AMENDED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Judge David O. Carter. Having considered Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC ("MBUSA") and Plaintiff's Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint, and good cause appearing therefore, the Court ORDERS that MBUSA shall have an additional 30 days to respond to the Complaint. Should Plaintiff file an amended complaint in that time frame, MBUSA's response to Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be due no later than 21 days after the date of its filing. Plaintiff's opposition papers to MBUSA's pre-answer motions shall be due no later than 21 days after such preanswer motions are filed, and MBUSA's reply papers in support of its pre-answer motions shall be due no later than 10 days after the filing of Plaintiff's opposition papers. (dro) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Mon 04/24 2:10 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT18 by Judge David O. Carter: Having considered Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC ("MBUSA") and Plaintiff's Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court ORDERS that MBUSA shall not be required to respond to the present Complaint, and that MBUSA's response to Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be due no later than 21 days after the date of its filing. Plaintiff's opposition papers to MBUSA's pre-answer motions shall be due no later than 21 days after such pre-answer motions are filed, and MBUSA's reply papers in support of its pre-answer motions shall be due no later than 10 days after the filing of Plaintiff's opposition papers. (dv) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 04/20 3:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by DEFENDANT Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Knapp, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 03/23 3:03 PM
***NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT*** ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-316 by Judge David O. Carter: The Stipulation for Relief from the ninety-day deadline imposed by Central District of California Civil Local Rule 23-3 is hereby granted. The deadline is extended until September 1, 2017. (dv) |
|
16 | 16
stip
Waive
Thu 03/23 11:37 AM
STIPULATION to Waive Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Luis Flores.(Mauro, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/22 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Molly Ann DeSario on behalf of Plaintiff Luis Flores (Attorney Molly Ann DeSario added to party Luis Flores(pty:pla))(DeSario, Molly) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 03/21 3:35 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Opposition and Reply Dates for Defendant's Pre Answer Motions10 . (twdb) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Appearance
Tue 03/21 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee on behalf of Plaintiff Luis Flores (Attorney Ruchira Piya Mukherjee added to party Luis Flores(pty:pla))(Mukherjee, Ruchira) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Tue 03/21 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Plaintiff Luis Flores (Attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio added to party Luis Flores(pty:pla))(Rivapalacio, Victoria) |
|
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 1:29 PM
|
|
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/21 11:00 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC answer now due 4/24/2017,, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Dates for Defendant's Pre-Answer Motions filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Knapp, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Opposition and Reply Dates for Defendant's Pre-Answer Motions | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 03/20 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUIREMENT TO GIVE NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1(Knapp, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 5:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Declaration3 , Declaration2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 served on March 16, 2017. (Yoshino, Troy) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 5:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation (DNAC) as Corporate Parent. (Yoshino, Troy) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 5:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Yoshino, Troy) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Thu 03/16 5:38 PM
DECLARATION of Noah Yanowitz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Yoshino, Troy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Thu 03/16 5:35 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas Brunner re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Yoshino, Troy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number 30-2017 00900221-CU-FR-CXC Receipt No: 0973-19529585 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Troy M Yoshino added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Yoshino, Troy) |
|
Att: 1 Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Demand Letter | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Luis Flores. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/27/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PAGE 5 OF 216) (ghap) |