Ana Rosa Castaneda et al v. MTC Financial, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00479 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Reconveyance Company
|
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MTC Financial, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Ana Rosa Castaneda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gumersindo Castaneda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/30 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Vokshori, Nima) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/22 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 14 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Lee, Christopher) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/22 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 10 filed by Defendant MTC Financial, Inc.. (Kosla, Martin) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/27 3:10 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/31/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Wed 04/26 11:28 PM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation Continuing Motion Briefing and Hearing Dates21 , The hearing re Motion originally scheduled have been rescheduled (Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna.) (mt) |
|
22 | 22
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/26 11:47 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Continue
Tue 04/25 3:40 PM
STIPULATION to Continue DEFENDANT MTC FINANCIAL INC. DBA TRUSTEE CORPS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT from May 15, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. to June 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 10 , Stipulation to Continue,20 filed by Plaintiffs Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda.(Vokshori, Nima) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
stip
Continue
Tue 04/25 1:51 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Motion Hearing from May 15, 2017 to June 5, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 10 filed by DEFENDANT MTC Financial, Inc..(Kosla, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing Motion Hearing and Briefing Schedule | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 04/18 10:12 AM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Denying Stipulation to Change Venue17 . DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. ** Please Note Corrected Case Number. (dro) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/13 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda. (Vokshori, Nima) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Change Venue
Thu 04/13 2:44 PM
STIPULATION to Change Venue to Central District of California - Western Division filed by Plaintiffs Ana Rosa Castaneda, Gumersindo Castaneda.(Vokshori, Nima) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Transferring Venue | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 03/24 9:52 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case14 , Request for Judicial Notice15 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: incorrect year. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 03/23 9:00 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 14 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Deed Trust 7-26-07, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Asign Deed Trust 3-9-11, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Sub of Trustee 3-9-11, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Not Default elect Sell 3-9-11, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Sub of Trustee 3-27-15, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Not Trustee Sale 5-27-15, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Trustee Deed Upon Sale 12-18-15, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Assign Deed Trust 7-22-15, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Assign Deed Trust 7-22-15, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Recission Assign 12-8-15, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Assign Deed Trust 11-16-15, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 4th Amend Complaint, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Order 6-2-14, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Judgment 7-18-14, | ||
Att: 15 Proof of Service | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 03/23 8:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
13 | 13
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 03/23 5:19 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 10 filed by Defendant MTC Financial, Inc.. (Kosla, Martin) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 5:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant MTC Financial, Inc. identifying MTC FINANCIAL INC. dba TRUSTEE CORPS as Corporate Parent. (Kosla, Martin) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant MTC Financial, Inc., identifying MTC FINANCIAL INC. dba TRUSTEE CORPS. (Kosla, Martin) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 03/23 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant MTC Financial, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attorney Martin Kosla added to party MTC Financial, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Kosla, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Points & Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 served on 3/22/17. (Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 10:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Exhibit (non-trial),,,,2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Exhibit (non-trial),,,,,3 served on March 16, 2017. (Fickel, Ashley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 10:39 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Parent Company of Chase); U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Fickel, Ashley) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 10:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Fickel, Ashley) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Thu 03/16 10:34 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Exhibits NN through PPP as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , Exhibit (non-trial),,,,2 .(Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit NN - MTC Req Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit OO - MTC Proof Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit PP - Notice Reject Req Dismissal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit QQ - Proposed Order JPMorgan Demurrer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit RR - Cert Mail and Minute Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit SS - MTC Notice Motion Mulifurcate, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit TT - MTC Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit UU - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit VV - MTC Motion Re-File Mot Change Venue, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit WW - MTC Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit XX - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit YY - JPMorgan Req Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit ZZ - Dec of C. Lee, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit AAA - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit BBB - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit CCC - JPMorgan Notice Re-File, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit DDD - Sub of Attorney, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit EEE - Dec of Steven Nunez, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit FFF - Sub of Attorney, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit GGG - Dec of Steven Nunez, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit HHH - Request Dismissal, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit III - First Amendd Complaint, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit JJJ - Pff Joint Opposition, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit KKK - Reply Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit LLL - Reply Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit MMM - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit NNN - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit OOO - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit PPP - Cert Mailing | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Thu 03/16 10:22 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Exhibit N through MM as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 .(Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit N - MTC Req Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit O - MTC Proof Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit P - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Q - JPMorgan Joinder, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit R - Notice Pffs Firm, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit S - MTC CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit T - JPMorgan CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit U - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit V - Notice Prelim Injunction, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit W - Minute ORder, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit X - Sub of Attorney, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Y - Order, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Z - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit AA - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit BB - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit CC - Minute Order, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit DD - Sub of Attorney, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit EE - Dec of H. Stephen, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit FF - Notice of CMC, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit GG - CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit HH - CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit II - CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit JJ - Notice re CMC, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit KK - CMC Statement, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit LL - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit MM - Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 9:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2016 00841019 Receipt No: 0973-19530394 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Ashley R Fickel added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Fickel, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - JPMorgan Demurrer, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Dec of Christopher Lee, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I (Part 1) - JPMorgan Req Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I (Part 2) - JPMorgan Req Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - MTC Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Notice of Hearing, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L - MTC Memo P&A, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Notice of Hearing | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 3:38 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Does 1-10, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MTC Financial, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Gumersindo Castaneda, Ana Rosa Castaneda. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:39 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants California Reconveyance Company, Does, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MTC Financial, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Gumersindo Castaneda, Ana Rosa Castaneda [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBITS document # 3 as ATTACHMENT #22](et) |