(HC)Clark v. Warden
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Thurston |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00377 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Petitioner
Raymond Clark
|
|
Respondent
Warden
|
GPO
Apr 19 2017
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 08/17 3:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Clark. (Flores, E) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 07/27 2:46 PM
ORDER of USCA as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Clark (DISMISSED for Lack of Jurisdiction) (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 06/26 2:11 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 17-16307 for4 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Clark. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appeal Processed to USCA
Wed 06/21 12:03 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re4 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Clark. Notice of Appeal filed *5/30/2017*, Complaint filed *3/15/2017* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *4/19/2017*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: Not Paid - Billed* Bill for fees due sent to *Raymond Clark* (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Information, | ||
Att: 2 Bill for Appeal Fee | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 06/21 12:04 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Appeal Processed to USCA served on Raymond Clark. (Jessen, A) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Other Court Case Number
Fri 04/21 12:56 PM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA case number 2:17-cv-03002. (Robles, S) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 04/19 10:50 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 04/19 10:50 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Raymond Clark. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 03/16 10:59 AM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Raymond Clark. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/16 10:58 AM
(2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Raymond Clark. (Gonzalez, R) |