McDonald v. United States of America
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony W Ishii |
Referred: | Stanley A Boone |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00385 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:22 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Amanda McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda McDonald
16632 CATTLE DRIVE
SPRINGVILLE, CA 93265 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Daniel Madriaga
134 Dover Place
Delano, VA 93215 |
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Fred Whitten
16485 Palomino Drive
Springville, CA 93265 |
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/17 2:13 PM
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/15 1:56 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Case by Amanda McDonald. (Mears, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons
Thu 08/10 2:33 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Daniel Madriaga, Fred Whitten* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mahana K. Weidler* *United States Department Of Justice - Tax Division* *555 4th Street, NW, Suite 7220* *Washington, DC 20001*. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/07 9:50 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America by Amanda McDonald.(Mears, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 08/07 8:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to file her first amended Complaint; Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before thirty (30) days after the first amended complaint is filed; and Plaintiff shall file the first amended Complaint within two (2) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2017. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 08/04 3:35 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint by Amanda McDonald.(Mears, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/25 4:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Scheduling Conference is reset from 8/14/2017 to 10/3/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/2017. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 07/21 10:05 AM
ANSWER, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Fred Whitten, Daniel Madriaga by United States of America., COUNTERCLAIM against Amanda McDonald by United States of America. by United States of America.(Weidler, Mahana) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 05/24 1:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 6/5/2017 to 8/14/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2017. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 05/11 1:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before July 21, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2017. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Wed 05/10 2:19 PM
STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Amanda McDonald. (Mears, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/09 10:30 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN OPPOSITION OR STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within five (5) days of the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2017. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/08 9:52 AM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,1 Complaint,4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,2 Summons (Unopposed Motion) by United States of America. Attorney Weidler, Mahana K. added. (Weidler, Mahana) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/21 4:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Amanda McDonald. (Mears, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/21 4:22 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Amanda McDonald. United States of America served on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Mears, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for AWI
Thu 03/16 8:38 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Thu 03/16 8:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Michael P. Mears* *Michael P. Mears, A Professional Corporation* *5500 Ming Avenue, Suite 225* *Bakersfield, CA 93309*. (Jessen, A) |
|
misc
Receipt
Thu 03/16 8:02 AM
RECEIPT number 0972-6964732 for $400.00 for Amanda McDonald from Michael P. Mears. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by Amanda McDonald.(Mears, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |