Gonzales v. Rutledge et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00387 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brad Darling
|
|
Defendant
Paulette Drake
|
|
Defendant
Bob Hastings
|
|
Defendant
Brooke A. Hastings
|
|
Defendant
Janet Fay Hastings
|
|
Defendant
Velda Murillo
|
|
Defendant
Bill Rutledge
|
|
Defendant
Dennis Sterk
|
|
Defendant
Cory Taylor
|
|
Defendant
W.S. Wahl
|
|
Plaintiff
Gerardo Gonzales
6212 Bel Aire Way
Bakersfield, CA 93309 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 01/12 2:33 PM
ORDER of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Gerardo Gonzales: appeal is construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal of this case under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). So construed, the motion is granted. (Flores, E) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/11 9:54 AM
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Motion to Withdraw to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals; ORDER Denying18 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal as Moot signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/11/2018. (Flores, E) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 01/11 9:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:20 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Flores, E) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/09 8:42 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Appeal by Gerardo Gonzales. (Flores, E) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/04 3:15 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS on Appeal by Gerardo Gonzales. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 01/03 2:13 PM
ORDER of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Gerardo Gonzales. Appellant has 21-Days to pay $505.00 filing fee to the District Court. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Appeal Processed to USCA
Thu 12/28 2:25 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re15 Notice of Appeal filed by Gerardo Gonzales. Notice of Appeal filed *12/28/2017*, Complaint filed *3/16/2017* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *12/14/2017*. Court Reporter: *None*. *Fee Status: Not Paid - Billed* Bill for fees due sent to *Gerardo Gonzales* (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Information, | ||
Att: 2 Bill for Appeal Fee | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 12/28 2:23 PM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Gerardo Gonzales as to13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 12/28 2:25 PM
fSERVICE BY MAIL:15 Notice of Appeal,16 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Thu 12/14 12:46 PM
JUDGMENT dated *12/14/17* pursuant to order (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
13 | 13
5
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/14 12:45 PM
ORDER ADOPTING10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS ; action is DISMISSED for Failure to State a Claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28:1915, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/14/17. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 12/14 12:46 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,14 Judgment served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Martin-Gill, S) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Thu 09/14 2:19 PM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS10 by Plaintiff Gerardo Gonzales. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Request for Judicial Notice
Fri 09/01 9:34 AM
REQUEST/Motion for JUDICIAL NOTICE of Legal Letter for Judicial Notice, Etc; and Declaration of Gerardo Gonzales in Support. (Hellings, J) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 08/30 8:29 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/17: 14-Day Deadline .(Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/30 8:30 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Hellings, J) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Request for Judicial Notice
Fri 08/11 9:32 AM
Legal Letter for the Court to Take JUDICIAL NOTICE; REQUEST for Immediate Action by This Court Due to Medical and Psychological Harm to Plaintiff; ORDER for Protection; Legal Questions by Gerardo Gonzales. (Hellings, J) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
misc
CAED Receipt
Thu 05/04 2:55 PM
RECEIPT number CAE100035581 for $400.00 civil filing fee by Gerardo Gonzales on 5/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/02 8:49 AM
ORDER ADOPTING4 Findings and Recommendations Recommending That Plaintiff's2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees Or Costs be Denied; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee in Full to Proceed With This Action Within Thirty Days, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/17. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 05/02 8:50 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Wed 04/26 2:20 PM
OBJECTIONS to4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Gerardo Gonzales. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/20 8:13 AM
ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's5 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations; Declaration of Gerardo Gonzales with Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 04/20 8:14 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order, served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Tue 04/18 11:20 AM
OBJECTIONS to4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Gerardo Gonzales. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 04/06 10:29 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Be Denied2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/17: 14-Day Deadline . (Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 04/06 10:30 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Hellings, J) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 03/21 9:01 AM
ORDER of DISQUALIFYING Magistrate Judge and Reassigning Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/17: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings, New Case No. 1:17-cv-00387 LJO BAM . (Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/21 9:01 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, served on Gerardo Gonzales. (Hellings, J) |
||
misc
IFP Application
Tue 03/21 9:02 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Hellings, J) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gerardo Gonzales. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Brad Darling, Paulette Drake, Bob Hastings, Brooke A. Hastings, Janet Fay Hastings, Velda Murillo, Bill Rutledge, Dennis Sterk, Cory Taylor, W.S. Wahl by Gerardo Gonzales.(Gonzalez, R) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
IFP Application
Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Gonzalez, R) |