In re: Salma H. Agha
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00389 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157(c)(1) Findings, Concl. & Proposed Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Debtor
Salma H. Agha
3751 Motor Ave. #34727
Los Angeles, CA 90034 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:40 AM PDT |
Trustee
August B. Landis
|
|
Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee (Frs)
|
|
Trustee
Jeffrey M Vetter
P.O. Box 2424
Bakersfield, CA 93303 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/08 12:17 PM
AMENDED ORDER Withdrawing Reference and Closing Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/17. (Marrujo, C) |
|
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Fri 09/08 9:51 AM
JUDGMENT dated *9/8/2017* pursuant to order (Marrujo, C) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/08 9:51 AM
ORDER WITHDRAWING Reference and Dismissing Case for Failure to Abide by Court Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 09/08 9:52 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order Dismissing Case,5 Judgment served on Salma H. Agha. (Marrujo, C) |
||
service
Service by Mail
Fri 09/08 12:21 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order served on Salma H. Agha. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/02 3:02 PM
AMENDED ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re2 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/2/17. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/02 3:02 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order to Show Cause served on Salma H. Agha. (Gonzalez, R) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/01 9:47 AM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Reference Should Not be Withdrawn and the Case Closed, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/31/17. Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2017. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 08/01 9:47 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Order to Show Cause served on Salma H. Agha. (Gonzalez, R) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
order
Order
Thu 03/16 1:29 PM
ORDER/RECOMMENDATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF THE REFERENCE FOR THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CHAPTER 7 CASE No. 10-16183 28 U.S.C. § 157(d). (Marrujo, C) |
|
Att: 1 USBC Docket Sheet |