Trujillo v. Save Mart Supermarkets et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Michael J Seng |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00391 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
RREF II-WPG Visalia Financed Parcels, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Save Mart Supermarkets
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Wed 05/10 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) On 5/9/2017, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal (Doc.9 ) under Rule 41. In light of Plaintiffs voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/10/2017. (Lafata, M) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/09 8:59 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MJS Appendix to Mandatory Sched Order
Thu 05/04 10:16 AM
APPENDIX to4 Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng: The parties are instructed to review and ensure compliance with the Instructions re Electronic Discovery and the Scheduling Conference Worksheet. (Davis, D) |
|
Att: 1 Sched Conf Worksheet | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/13 2:40 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,3 Summons Stipulation to Extend Time for RREFII-WPG Visalia Financed Parcels, LLC to Respond to Initial Complaint by RREF II-WPG Visalia Financed Parcels, LLC. Attorney Hamidi, Ali P. added. (Hamidi, Ali) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/04 4:20 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Save Mart Supermarkets Waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/03 9:57 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: RREF II-WPG Visalia Financed Parcels, LLC served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil New Case Documents for LJO
Thu 03/16 2:38 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons
Thu 03/16 2:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *RREF II-WPG Visalia Financed Parcels, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Jessen, A) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons
Thu 03/16 2:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Save Mart Supermarkets* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Jessen, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6966291)(Best, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |