(PC) Jones v. Lebeck
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Defendant
J. Lebeck
|
|
Plaintiff
Larry V. Jones
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Thu 09/21 2:10 PM
JUDGMENT dated *9/21/17* entered pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/17. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
5 | 5
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 09/21 2:09 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff's1 complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Plaintiff's2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 09/21 2:11 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order, and6 Judgment served on Larry V. Jones. (Kastilahn, A) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/28 11:58 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Larry V. Jones. (Becknal, R) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Thu 03/16 2:12 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/20/2017 (Becknal, R) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Thu 03/16 2:12 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Larry V. Jones. (Becknal, R) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:11 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Larry V. Jones. (Becknal, R) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:10 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Lebeck by Larry V. Jones.(Becknal, R) |