Gittens v. Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Morgan Southern, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Transport Enterprise Leasing, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Dominick G. Gittens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minute Order
Mon 06/12 8:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal (ECF No.4 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety; Case CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/08 1:18 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Dominick G. Gittens. (Wasserman, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
service
Summons
Thu 03/16 8:34 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Morgan Southern, Inc., Roadrunner Intermodal Services, LLC, Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc., Transport Enterprise Leasing, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Joshua Wasserman* *Mayall Hurley, P.C* *2453 Grand Canal Blvd.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Kaminski, H) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
misc
Civil New Case Documents for KJM
Thu 03/16 8:30 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 17 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dominick G. Gittens. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6964580)(Wasserman, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |