Wilke v. SACMI USA
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00565 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
SACMI USA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Wilke
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 09/28 3:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/28/2017: Pursuant the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.9 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees except as provided for in their Confidential Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Krueger, M) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/28 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by SACMI USA re9 Stipulation of Dismissal - ATY. (Oliveira, Kristin) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/28 3:01 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 41; and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal by SACMI USA. (Oliveira, Kristin) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 05/18 1:30 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/17/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/29/2018. Discovery due by 1/29/2018. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 7/26/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/28 10:24 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by SACMI USA. (Lawler, Christin) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/20 12:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by SACMI USA. (Lawler, Christin) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/16 1:40 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by SACMI USA. Attorney Lawler, Christin Anne added. (Lawler, Christin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil New Case Documents for TLN
Thu 03/16 8:31 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by SACMI USA (Oliveira, Kristin) | |
2 | 2 STATEMENT of Disclosure Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.7.1 by Defendant SACMI USA re1 Notice of Removal. (Oliveira, Kristin) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2017 00207898 by SACMI USA. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6964787)(Oliveira, Kristin) Modified on 3/16/2017 (Zignago, K.). | |
Att: 1 Declaration |