California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:17-cv-01431
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2017
Terminated:Nov 30, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:25 AM PDT
Amicus
Coin Center
718 7th Street
Washington, DC 20001
Represented By
Hartley M.K. West
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amicus
Competitive Enterprise Institute
Competitive Enterprise Institute 1310 L St NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Theodore Harold Frank
Competitive Enterprise Institute
contact info
Amicus
Digital Currency and Ledger Defense Coalition
Represented By
Colby Brian Springer
Polsinelli LLP
contact info
Defendant
Digital Currency and Ledger Defense Coalition
2029 Century Park East 16th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Jeffery Todd Gorham
Frost Brown Todd
contact info
Intervenor
John Doe 4
Represented By
Albert G. Lum
Bern Weiss LLP
contact info
Lee A. Weiss
Berns Weiss LLP
contact info
Jeffrey K Berns
Berns Weiss LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
John Doe 1
Represented By
Lee A. Weiss
Berns Weiss LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
John Doe 2
Represented By
Lee A. Weiss
Berns Weiss LLP
contact info
Intervenor Pla
John Doe 3
Represented By
Emmanuel Youkhanna Rayes
Rayes Law
contact info
Petitioner
United States
U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division P.O. Box 683 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
Landon Monte Yost
Doj Tax Division
contact info
Colin Christopher Sampson
U.S. Department Of Justice, United States Attorney'S Of
contact info
Jeremy N Hendon
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Amy Talburt Matchison
Department Of Justice
contact info
Respondent
Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By
Steven A. Ellis
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Grant P. Fondo
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Michael Timothy Lempres
Attorney At Law
contact info
Shauna E. Woods
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Juan Antonio Suarez
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2017
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-1431. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 17, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
GPO Jul 18 2017
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 10 Motion to Intervene; granting 12 Motion Proceed Under Fictitious Names; granting 14 Administrative Motion Proceed Under Fictitious Names; denying 19 Motion to Intervene; and granting 39 Stipulation TO SUBSTITUTE PROPOSED INTERVENOR JOHN DOE 4 FOR PROPOSED INTERVENORS JOHN DOES 1 AND 2(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)

1. Coinbase Loses Bid to Block U.S. Tax Probe of Bitcoin Gains (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Wed 11/29/2017
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, December 22, 2017
79 79 misc Transcript Order Fri 10:50 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/9/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Digital Currency and Ledger Defense Coalition, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
Related: [-]