Roberts v. Veterans Village Enterprises, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Larry Alan Burns |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00524 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
|
|
Defendant
Veterans Village Enterprises, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 04/25 1:25 PM
ORDER of Dismissal. Plaintiff Michael Roberts has filed a notice of dismissal without prejudice. Defendant has not answered or appeared in this case. This action is therefore DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/24/17.(kas) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/21 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Roberts(Pease, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 04/21 8:18 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Revocation of In Forma Pauperis Status. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause why his IFP status should not be revoked, either by filing the supplemental briefing he should have filed before, or by filing a memorandum of points and authorities, not longer than five pages, giving adequate reasons for his failure to do so. He must do so no later than the close of business on Monday, April 24, 2017. If Roberts fails to show cause as ordered, his IFP status will be revoked. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/20/17.(kas) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 03/27 9:09 AM
ORDER screening complaint and authorizing service by U.S. Marshals Service Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/24/17.(kas) (IFP package prepared) (kas) |
|
Att: 1 (3/27/2017) IFP letter | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:30 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kas) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 8:30 AM
ORDER denying2 Motion for TRO, granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Roberts is ORDERED to file a supplement to his IFP motion. He must do this within 30 calendar days of the date this order is issued. The Clerk is directed to issue a summons. If Roberts wishes to file a renewed request for preliminary injunctive relief, he should do so after Veterans Village has been served with process. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/20/17. (kas) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 03/17 3:14 PM
Minute Order: On March 16, Plaintiff filed his complaint along with a motion for temporary restraining order and a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as several amended supplemental documents. The Court expects to issue a separate order ruling on the motion proceeding in forma pauperis and may set a briefing schedule on the temporary restraining order, as appropriate. Until directed to do so, Defendant will not be required to respond to the motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/17/2017 (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance).(Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 03/16 4:24 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael Roberts. Amendment to5 Amended Document .(Pease, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix certificate of service | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 03/16 4:22 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael Roberts. Amendment to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Bryan Pease . (Pease, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael Roberts. Amendment to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Michael Roberts . (Pease, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Roberts. (mpl) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 2:28 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 03/16 2:23 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Roberts. (mpl) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/16/2017) (mpl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, IFP Filed, filed by Michael Roberts. The new case number is 3:17-cv-524-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Pease, Bryan)(mpl) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/16/2017) (mpl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |