Kreuzer v. Qualcomm Incorporated
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gonzalo P Curiel |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:0002at Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Qualcomm Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Kreuzer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Transfer Letter Received
Tue 04/25 3:28 PM
Transfer Letter Received from Northern District of CA. Case number in other court is 5:17-cv-02172 (kas) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Transferred Out - District FORM
Mon 04/24 2:06 PM
Case transferred to the Northern District of CA pursuant to MDL no. 2773 CTO-1. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of CA*. (kas) |
|
Att: 1 CTO-1 | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/06 5:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qualcomm Incorporated. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Rizk, David) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David W Rizk on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Rizk, David)Attorney David W Rizk added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Sessions, Justina)Attorney Justina Kahn Sessions added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Morris Paige on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Paige, Eugene)Attorney Eugene Morris Paige added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Bhansali, Asim)Attorney Asim M. Bhansali added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Van Nest on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Van Nest, Robert)Attorney Robert A. Van Nest added to party Qualcomm Incorporated(pty:dft) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule
Tue 03/21 3:12 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-00108-GPC-MDD. The new case number is 17cv00526 GPC-MDD.Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/20/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/17/17.(kas) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 2:37 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Qualcomm Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9903761.), filed by David Kreuzer. The new case number is 3:17-cv-526-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hartley, Jason)(dsn) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |