Paw et al v. United States of America
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Referred: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00532 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 07:2023(a) Judicial Review of Food Stamp Disqualification |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nyien Nyien Aye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Win Htut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tar Lue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sue Tha Lei Paw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Friday Moe Ro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yoon Wady Food Store
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 09/07 10:18 AM
ORDER Granting34 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/2018. (sjm) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/23 6:57 AM
NOTICE Joint Motion to Dismiss by Nyien Nyien Aye, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Yoon Wady Food Store (Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 08/09 4:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: For administrative purposes, the motion filed at ECF No.24 is denied as moot in light of the order granting the parties' joint motion for stipulated protective order (ECF No.28 ). (no document attached) (axy) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 06/18 10:52 AM
ORDER: (1) Granting in Part29 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, and (2) Issuing Amended Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 1/8/2019, if needed. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/15/2018. (mxn) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/11 2:20 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A Status Conference regarding the parties' Joint Motion to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order (ECF No.29 ) was held on 6/11/2018. The Court hereby SETS a continued telephonic Status Conference for 6/15/2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of the Conference, counsel shall place a joint call to chambers with all participating counsel on the line. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Zachary Tapp).(Defendant Attorney Daniel Everett Butcher). (no document attached) (axy) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/07 3:33 PM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A telephonic, counsel only Status Conference regarding the parties' Joint Motion to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order (ECF No.29 ) is here by SET for 6/11/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of the Conference, counsel shall place a joint call to chambers with all participating counsel already on the line. (axy) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 06/07 8:53 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct23 Scheduling Order,, by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 05/31 11:09 AM
ORDER: (1) Granting27 Joint Motion for Protective Order, and (2) Entering Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/29/2018. (mxn) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Tue 05/29 11:42 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 05/22 10:51 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A Status Conference regarding Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order (ECF No.24 ) was held on 5/21/2018. The parties are granted leave to file a motion for protective order on or before 6/1/2018. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Zachary Tapp). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Everett Butcher). (no document attached) (axy) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/17 10:00 AM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Court hereby SETS a telephonic Status Conference for 5/21/2018 at 2:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt regarding Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order (ECF No.24 ). For purposes of the Conference, counsel shall place a joint call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers with all participating counsel already on the line. (axy) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Protective Order
Tue 05/15 4:32 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel E. Butcher, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/18 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Case Management Conference was held on 4/17/2018. Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 9/5/2018 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/20/2018, if needed. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/18/2018.(mxn) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 04/17 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A Case Management Conference was held on 4/17/2018. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Zachary Tapp). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Everett Butcher). (no document attached) (axy) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/12 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the TIME of the Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2018 is hereby RESET to 4:15 PM. (no document attached) (axy) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 04/09 5:57 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nyien Nyien Aye, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Yoon Wady Food Store. Amendment to19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Amended Joint Discovery Plan to correct pages not uploaded. .(Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service-Joint Discovery Plan | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 04/09 5:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service-Joint Discovery Plan | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/30 1:34 PM
Order Setting Case Management Conference. Telephonic, Attorneys-only Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/29/2018. (jjg) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 03/29 3:39 PM
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Defendant's12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant may renew its motion relying on its present motion after completion of discovery. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Burkhardt to conduct a case management conference (CMC). Discovery shall be completed within 120 days of the CMC. The pretrial conference will be held on 10/23/2018 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/29/2018. (mxn) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Motions Submitted
Mon 09/25 1:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER, Motions Submitted12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (no document attached) (rfm) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 09/08 4:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Custodian of Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Shanta Swezy, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/01 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nyien Nyien Aye, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Yoon Wady Food Store.(Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside
Tue 08/22 12:35 PM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's9 Motion for Reconsideration, and to Vacate, Set Aside or Stay Court's Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/22/2017. (mxn) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 08/18 3:25 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/15 10:38 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Set Aside7 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Cross Motions,, Motion for Reconsideration, and to Vacate, Set Aside or Stay Court's Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 08/01 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No.9 : On or before 8/15/2017, Defendant SHALL file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, and to Vacate, Set Aside or Stay Court's Order (see ECF No.9 ). (no document attached) (smm) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Set Aside
Fri 07/21 2:39 PM
MOTION to Set Aside7 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Cross Motions,, Motion for Reconsideration, and to Vacate, Set Aside or Stay Court's Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Nyien Nyien Aye, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Yoon Wady Food Store.(Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lodgment
Fri 06/23 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by United States of America (Administrative Record)(Butcher, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Cross Motions
Tue 05/30 3:19 PM
Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for summary judgment by 7/21/2017. Defendant shall file and serve an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by 8/18/2017. Plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the cross-motion and a reply to opposition by 9/1/2017. Defendant shall file any reply to opposition to the the cross-motion by 9/8/2017. Motion Hearing shall be scheduled for 9/22/2017 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/30/2017. (fth) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/26 12:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Butcher, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Everett Butcher added to party United States of America(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 5:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yoon Wady Food Store, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Nyien Nyien Aye. United States of America served.(Tapp, Andrew) (rlu) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PS Form 3811 | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Mon 04/24 10:18 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew Zachary Tapp appearing for Plaintiffs Nyien Nyien Aye, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Yoon Wady Food Store (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/24 9:59 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10015613.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Tapp, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 4:51 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9904675.), filed by Yoon Wady Food Store, Sue Tha Lei Paw, Friday Moe Ro, Win Htut, Tar Lue, Nyien Nyien Aye. The new case number is 3:17-cv-532-BTM-JLB. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Clowney, Frank)(mpl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |