Moore v. Birmingham Board of Education et al
Alabama Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John H England, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00408 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Birmingham Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Larry Contri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Craig Witherspoon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George C Moore, Jr
1817 7th Avenue NW
Birmingham, AL 35215 |
GPO
Sep 18 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/18/2019. (AFS) |